Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. v. United States Department of Justice
Plaintiff: Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Case Number: 1:2019cv03429
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:0552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time through and including 11/11/2019 for United States Department of Justice to file a responsive pleading to the #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/28/2019. (adg)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint with Brief In Support by United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Samuel) Modified on 8/28/2019 (adg).
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. United States Department of Justice served on 8/5/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service to U.S. Department of Justice, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service to U.S. Attorney General, #3 Exhibit Proof of Service to U.S. Attorney NDGA)(Hermann, Kimberly)
August 5, 2019 Clerks Notation re #5 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed by MHC. (lwb)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 7/31/19. (bnw)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. (eop)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to United States Attorney Office. (eop)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to William P. Barr. (eop)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to United States Department of Justice. (eop)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8827310) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. v. United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Samuel Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly Stewart Hermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?