White v. Equifax Information Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Kenneth White
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03482
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Referring Judge: Alan J Baverman
2 Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kenneth White re #12 Request For Copy of Recent Docket Sheet. Docket Sheet mailed to Plaintiff. (tcc)
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC for first set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents and Requests for Admission to Plaintiff (Emmanuel, Elizabeth)
September 23, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kenneth White re #10 Order, #5 Notice to Pro Se Parties, and a copy of the docket sheet. (jpa)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to send plaintiff copies of this Order, the previous #4 order, the #5 Notice to Pro Se Plaintiffs, and the docket sheet. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement within 30 days. IT IS ORDERED that the #8 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan is APPROVED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 9/23/19. (jpa)
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 PRO SE MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re: #10 Order, by Kenneth White. (tcc)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address for Kenneth White. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tcc)
September 17, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kenneth White re Case Assigned/Reassigned,. (rsh)
September 17, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Steven D. Grimberg. Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-cv-3482-SDG-AJB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (rsh)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address for Kenneth White. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tcc)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Emmanuel, Elizabeth)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC for Initial Disclosures (Emmanuel, Elizabeth)
August 22, 2019 Submission of #4 Order to Show Cause to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (usw)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Discovery ends on 1/6/2020.(Emmanuel, Elizabeth) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 6, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kenneth White re #5 Notice to Pro Se Parties. (usw)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to Pro Se Plaintiffs, signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 08/06/2019. (usw)
August 6, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kenneth White re #4 Order to Show Cause. (usw)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is ordered to file his certificate of interested persons / corporate disclosure statement within 10 DAYS of this Order. Failure to timely comply with this Order may result in sanctions, up to and including the striking of pleadings or dismissal of the action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 08/06/2019. (usw)
August 5, 2019 Clerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons: reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (se)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John Anthony Love on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC (Love, John)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Emmanuel, Elizabeth)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-8834066) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: John Anthony Love
Represented By: Elizabeth Emmanuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?