Kadribasic v. Walmart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ismeta Kadribasic
Defendant: Walmart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03498
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Bly
Referring Judge: Steven D Grimberg
2 Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Steven D. Grimberg. Judge Steve C. Jones no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-cv-03498-SDG-CCB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (rjs)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Persons by Ismeta Kadribasic. (Kertscher, Douglas)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart Stores, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Walmart Inc., Other Affiliate Sam's East, Inc. for Walmart Stores, Inc.. (Lott, Joshua)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Walmart Stores, Inc.. Discovery ends on 2/7/2020.(Lott, Joshua) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS #6 Defendant Walmart Stores Inc.'s consent motion to extend the deadline to file its answer to the complaint. The deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended through and including September 10, 2019. ORDERED BY Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on August 23, 2019. (jtj)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by Walmart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pope, Benson)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Mathias Lott on behalf of Walmart Stores, Inc. (Lott, Joshua)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Benson Edward Pope on behalf of Walmart Stores, Inc. (Pope, Benson)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by Ismeta Kadribasic. Walmart Stores, Inc. served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Kertscher, Douglas)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Walmart Stores, Inc.. (tmf)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Ismeta Kadribasic. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8836791) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kadribasic v. Walmart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ismeta Kadribasic
Represented By: Julie Anne Hoehn Burke
Represented By: Douglas R. Kertscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Mathias Lott
Represented By: Benson Edward Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?