Abedi v. U. S. Bank National Association
Plaintiff: Parviz Abedi
Defendant: U. S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 1:2019cv03544
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J Clay Fuller
Referring Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Submission of #2 MOTION to Remand to State Court and #3 MOTION for Sanctions to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (rjs)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE re #2 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #3 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Parviz Abedi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deed page with Section 19, #2 Exhibit Superior Court Order, #3 Exhibit Transcript Cobb Superior Court emergency Hearing)(Repasky, Alexander)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by U. S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Parker, Leah)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Sanctions with Brief In Support by U. S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Brief Defendant U.S. Bank National Association's Brief In Support of Motion for Sanctions, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of D. Lee Clayton)(Parker, Leah)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Remand to State Court with Brief In Support by Parviz Abedi. (Attachments: #1 Brief Petitioner's Brief In Support Of Motion To Remand, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Repasky, Alexander)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by U. S. Bank National Association. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-8843856) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abedi v. U. S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parviz Abedi
Represented By: Alexander Joseph Repasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U. S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Douglas Lee Clayton
Represented By: Leah Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?