Zayo Group, LLC v. GA Cable Inc.
Plaintiff: Zayo Group, LLC
Defendant: GA Cable Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03581
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (ddm)
August 30, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). Each party shall bear their own fees and costs. (ddm)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Zayo Group, LLC (Ketchum, Daniel)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by Zayo Group, LLC. GA Cable Inc. served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (Ketchum, Daniel)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to GA Cable Inc.. (tcc)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Zayo Group, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8848845) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zayo Group, LLC v. GA Cable Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zayo Group, LLC
Represented By: Anthony J. Jorgenson
Represented By: Daniel R. Ketchum, II
Represented By: Katie N. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GA Cable Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?