SendSig, LLC v. Square, Inc.
Plaintiff: SendSig, LLC
Defendant: Square, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03733
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Nicholas F. Lenning Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9007792). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Square, Inc.. (Jones, Todd)
October 16, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Elizabeth J. Weiskopf Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9007769). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Square, Inc.. (Jones, Todd)
October 16, 2019 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission of Theodore J. Angelis Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9007721). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Square, Inc.. (Jones, Todd)
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Persons by Square, Inc.. (Jones, Todd)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Square, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Todd)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 9/12/19. (bnw)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, through October 15, 2019, for Defendant to respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 9/10/19. (ddm)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by SendSig, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
September 2, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by SendSig, LLC. Square, Inc. served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Kent, Daniel)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Cabrach John Connor; granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Jennifer Tatum Lee. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/29/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
August 28, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Cabrach John Connor Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8884405). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Cabrach J. Connor added appearing on behalf of SendSig, LLC (pmb)
August 28, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Jennifer Tatum Lee Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8884406). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Jennifer Tatum Lee added appearing on behalf of SendSig, LLC (pmb)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Jennifer Tatum Lee Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8884406). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by SendSig, LLC. (Kent, Daniel)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Cabrach John Connor Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8884405). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by SendSig, LLC. (Kent, Daniel)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Square, Inc.. (eop)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SendSig, LLC.(eop)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (eop)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by SendSig, LLC. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8874692) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -US Pat No. 6,564,249, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SendSig, LLC v. Square, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Square, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Edward Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SendSig, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Arthur Kent
Represented By: Jennifer Tatum Lee
Represented By: Cabrach J. Connor
Represented By: Kevin Sean Kudlac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?