McDaniel v. Trans Union LLC et al
Plaintiff: Leroy McDaniel
Defendant: Avant of Georgia, LLC and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03737
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Bly
Referring Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement Avant of Georgia, LLC by Leroy McDaniel (Sieg, Paul)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Leroy McDaniel. Trans Union LLC waiver mailed on 8/23/2019, answer due 10/22/2019. (Sieg, Paul)
September 30, 2019 Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Leroy McDaniel. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
September 29, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Leroy McDaniel. (Sieg, Paul)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Leroy McDaniel. Avant of Georgia, LLC waiver mailed on 8/23/2019, answer due 10/22/2019. (Sieg, Paul)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Leroy McDaniel. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8875533) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDaniel v. Trans Union LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avant of Georgia, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy McDaniel
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Berry
Represented By: Adam Klein
Represented By: Paul Jonathan Sieg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?