Council v. Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joyce Council
Defendant: Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03743
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Referring Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.. Discovery ends on 3/16/2020.(Smith, Andrew) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 9/26/19. (jpa)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.'s Answer due 10/18/2019. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 9/23/19. (jpa)
September 16, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Steven D. Grimberg. Judge Steve C. Jones no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-cv-03743-SDG. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (rjs)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Andrew)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Navient Corporation for Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.. (Smith, Andrew)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Joyce Council. Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Hormozdi, Shireen)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 COURT'S NOTICE Of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES.(pdw)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joyce Council identifying Corporate Parent Navient Corporation for Joyce Council. (Hormozdi, Shireen)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. (bdb)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Joyce Council. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8876171) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Council v. Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Zachery Ryan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Council
Represented By: Gary Klinger
Represented By: Shireen Hormozdi
Represented By: Michael Lewis Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?