The Plan Consulting Group, LLC v. Morrison Management Specialists, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The Plan Consulting Group, LLC
Defendant: Morrison Management Specialists, Inc. and Crothall Healthcare, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03797
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing parties to binding Arbitration in compliance with Section 13 of the Contract giving rise to this Action within 45 days by Plaintiff's filing of its Demand for Arbitration. This matter is stayed pending the conclusion of the Arbitration. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 10/15/2019. (dob)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings And Refer Case to Arbitration Pursuant to 9 U.S.C. Sec. 3 by The Plan Consulting Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Consent Order)(Keough, Thomas)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Crothall Healthcare, Inc., Morrison Management Specialists, Inc.. Discovery ends on 2/18/2020.(Coalson, Jennifer) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by The Plan Consulting Group, LLC. Crothall Healthcare, Inc. served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Keough, Thomas)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by The Plan Consulting Group, LLC. Morrison Management Specialists, Inc. served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Keough, Thomas)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (bgt)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Crothall Healthcare, Inc., Morrison Management Specialists, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Crothall Healthcare, Inc.)(tmf)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons by The Plan Consulting Group, LLC. (tmf)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by The Plan Consulting Group, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8883695) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Plan Consulting Group, LLC v. Morrison Management Specialists, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morrison Management Specialists, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Kathleen Coalson
Represented By: Joseph Matthew Maguire, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crothall Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Kathleen Coalson
Represented By: Joseph Matthew Maguire, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Plan Consulting Group, LLC
Represented By: Thomas V. Keough
Represented By: William K. Carmichael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?