Franklin v. Wellcare Health Plans Inc.
Plaintiff: Ricky R. Franklin
Defendant: WellCare Health Plans, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03816
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Referring Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #13 Order by Ricky R. Franklin. (tcc)
October 2, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ricky R. Franklin re #13 Order. (jpa)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 9/26/19. (jpa)
September 17, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ricky R. Franklin re NEF Case Assigned/Reassigned. (jta)
September 17, 2019 Submission of #12 Complaint, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (jta)
September 17, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Steven D. Grimberg. Judge Michael L. Brown no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-cv-3816-SDG. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (jta)
August 26, 2019 Submission of #12 Complaint, for frivolity review, to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (klb)
August 26, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ricky R. Franklin re #11 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (klb)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Ricky R. Franklin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(klb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #2 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. It is further ORDERED that service of process shall not issue at this time. The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit this case to the District Court for a frivolity determination pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 8/26/19. (klb)
August 23, 2019 Submission of #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (aar)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:19-cv-02049. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1404(a) and 1406(a), this case is TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Georgia for all further proceedings. The Clerk is directed to immediately transfer the file to that District. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/22/2019. (BGS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/23/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Ricky R. Franklin. (CTR) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/23/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ricky R. Franklin. Related case(s): no (CTR) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/23/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #5 Order to show cause filed by Ricky R. Franklin. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(CTR) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/23/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is directed to SHOW CAUSE as to why this case should not be transferred to the Atlanta Division of the Northern District of Georgia. Plaintiff shall file a written response with the Court within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS from the date of this Order. Alternatively, if Plaintiff believes that transfer is appropriate, it shall file a notice stating the same. Failure to respond within the time provided will result in the transfer of this case without further notice. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/19/2019. (BGS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/23/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/30/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/16/2019. (BGS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/23/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/30/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/16/2019. (BGS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/23/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ricky R. Franklin. (summons enclosed)(CTR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/23/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wellcare Health Plans Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Ricky R. Franklin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Mailing Envelope)(CTR) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/23/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. Wellcare Health Plans Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky R. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WellCare Health Plans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?