Rigsby et al v. GoDaddy Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The Scott Rigsby Foundation, Inc. and Scott Rigsby
Defendant: GoDaddy Inc., Desert Newco, LLC, GoDaddy.com, LLC and Go Daddy Operating Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv03824
Filed: August 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125a
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 27 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Under GA UDPTA by The Scott Rigsby Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hanyen Profile statutes)(Dalziel, Charles)
October 21, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE re #20 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case filed preliminary to Motion for declaratory judgment filed by Scott Rigsby. (Dalziel, Charles)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #23 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/21/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnw)
October 21, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #23 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeffrey M. Monhait Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9005562). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Jeffrey Monhait added appearing on behalf of Go Daddy Operating Company, GoDaddy Inc., GoDaddy.com, LLC (cdg)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 the parties' Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defense Motions. Plaintiffs shall have through and including October 19, 2019, to file their response to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue or, in the alternative, Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/18/19. (ddm)
October 17, 2019 Filing 24 First MOTION for Extension of Time respond to defense motions re: #20 MOTION to Dismiss and Transfer by Scott Rigsby. (Dalziel, Charles)
October 15, 2019 Filing 23 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeffrey M. Monhait Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9005562). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Desert Newco, LLC, Go Daddy Operating Company, GoDaddy Inc., GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Courts Admitted)(Moss, Alycen)
October 15, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Alycen A. Moss on behalf of Desert Newco, LLC, Go Daddy Operating Company, GoDaddy Inc., GoDaddy.com, LLC (Moss, Alycen)
October 7, 2019 RETURN of #19 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeffrey M. Monhait Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8974508). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: local counsel. (pmb)
October 2, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Desert Newco, LLC, Go Daddy Operating Company, GoDaddy Inc., GoDaddy.com, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Kohlberg Kravis Roberts & Co. L.P. for Desert Newco, LLC, Go Daddy Operating Company, GoDaddy Inc., GoDaddy.com, LLC by Desert Newco, LLC, Go Daddy Operating Company, GoDaddy Inc., GoDaddy.com, LLC.(Espy-Williams, Lynnette)
October 2, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Transfer Venue or, in the alternative, MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Desert Newco, LLC, Go Daddy Operating Company, GoDaddy Inc., GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue, or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Jessica Hanyen in Support of Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue, or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss, #3 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue, or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Espy-Williams, Lynnette) . Added MOTION to Transfer Case on 10/17/2019 (ddm).
October 1, 2019 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Admission of Jeffrey M. Monhait Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8974508). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Desert Newco, LLC, Go Daddy Operating Company, GoDaddy Inc., GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A (List of Courts to which Petitioner Jeffrey Monhait is admitted))(Espy-Williams, Lynnette)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting the #17 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time, through October 2, 2019, for Defendants to respond to #1 Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 9/19/19. (ddm)
September 18, 2019 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Desert Newco, LLC, Go Daddy Operating Company, GoDaddy Inc., GoDaddy.com, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint)(Espy-Williams, Lynnette)
September 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynnette D. Espy-Williams on behalf of Desert Newco, LLC, Go Daddy Operating Company, GoDaddy Inc., GoDaddy.com, LLC (Espy-Williams, Lynnette)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 9/12/19. (bnw)
September 10, 2019 Filing 14 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (ddm)
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED AO 120 Plaintiffs. (Dalziel, Charles)
September 4, 2019 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (eop)
August 31, 2019 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by Scott Rigsby. GoDaddy.com, LLC served on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019. (Dalziel, Charles)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by Scott Rigsby. Desert Newco, LLC served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Dalziel, Charles)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Scott Rigsby. Go Daddy Operating Company served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Dalziel, Charles)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Scott Rigsby. GoDaddy Inc. served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Dalziel, Charles)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Scott Rigsby Civil Cover Sheet (Dalziel, Charles)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(ddm)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Scott Rigsby GoDaddy.com, LLC (Dalziel, Charles)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Scott Rigsby Desert Newco, LLC (Dalziel, Charles)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Scott Rigsby GoDaddy Operating Company, LLC (Dalziel, Charles)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Scott Rigsby GoDaddy.com, LLC (Dalziel, Charles)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Scott Rigsby GoDaddy Inc. (Dalziel, Charles)
August 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Scott Rigsby and The Scott Rigsby Foundation, Inc.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8887587) (eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rigsby et al v. GoDaddy Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Scott Rigsby Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Charles M. Dalziel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Rigsby
Represented By: Charles M. Dalziel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoDaddy Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Newco, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoDaddy.com, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Go Daddy Operating Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?