James v. DeKalb County School District
Plaintiff: Naeema James
Defendant: DeKalb County School District
Case Number: 1:2019cv03831
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:0552
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #7 MOTION to Refund Court Fee, #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DeKalb County School District. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Response)(Farmer, Randall)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall C. Farmer on behalf of DeKalb County School District (Farmer, Randall)
October 9, 2019 Submission of #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (ddm)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Refund Court Fee by Naeema James. (ddm)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Naeema James. (ddm)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by DeKalb County School District. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Warco, Laurance)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Naeema James. DeKalb County School District served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (ddm)
September 12, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Naeema James re #3 Order. (bnw)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 9/12/19. (bnw)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to DeKalb County School District. (eop)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Naeema James. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number GAN100115136) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. DeKalb County School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naeema James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeKalb County School District
Represented By: Brandon Moulard
Represented By: Laurance Joseph Warco
Represented By: Randall C. Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?