Jane Doe 1 v. Red Roof Inns, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 1
Defendant: Choice Hotels International, Inc., John Does 1-10, Red Roof Inns, Inc., BRE/LQ Properties, LLC, Varahi Hotel, LLC, SUB-SU Hotel GP, LLC, WHG SU Atlanta LP, ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee, LLC, FMW RRI NC, LLC, Westmont Hospitality Group, Inc., CPLG Properties, LLC, ESA P Portfolio, LLC, Extended Stay America, Inc., ESA Management, LLC, LQ Properties, LLC and La Quinta Worldwide, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03840
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 18:1589
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE Setting Hearings: The Court sets a status hearing to begin at 9:30 a.m. before the Honorable William M. Ray, II on the following dates: Friday, February 7, 2020, Friday, March 6, 2020, Friday, April 24, 2020, Friday, June 5, 2020, Friday, July 10, 2020, Friday, August 7, 2020, Friday, September 4, 2020 and Friday, October 2, 2020 in Courtroom 1705, Richard B. Russell Federal Building, 75 Ted Turner Drive, SW, Atlanta, Georgia 30303. See order for other specifics. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/23/2019. (jed)
October 23, 2019 Filing 69 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William M. Ray, II: Motion Hearing held on 10/23/2019 re #17 MOTION for Protective Order and MOTION for Leave to Proceed Anonymously. MOTION Hearing set for 11/25/2019 at 09:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1705 before Judge William M. Ray II. The Court discussed the motion to transfer cases pending in the Jane Doe 2 & 3 cases. As there are no objections, Judge Ray will contact the other judges to seek a re-assignment (not consolidation) of these related cases. Parties discussed a forthcoming amended complaint and revised proposed protective order. The Court stated it will not rule on the #17 motion yet, but that if parties have not resolved it within 6 months of its filing date, the Court will deny it as moot. Parties advised the motion for protective order should be resolved promptly and the motion for more definite statement would be mooted by an amended complaint. Parties are in consent about additional time for Plaintiff to amend the complaint and adhere to the same time frame as the other Doe cases. The Court will enter the scheduling order as proposed. The Amended Complaint is due by 11/21 and the Answer is due within 21 days thereafter; Initial Disclosures due 12/16; written discovery begins 1/1/20; depositions begin 3/1/20; expert witnesses disclosed by 9/1/20; discovery will end 10/31/20 and summary judgment motions due 11/30/20. The Court cautioned counsel about the need for pushing this case forward in a timely manner. Plaintiffs seek 6 months for discovery; Defendants do not think this is unreasonable but as the identities of the Plaintiffs are still concealed, they cannot agree at this time and argue more than 6 months may be needed. The Court will allow 8 months of discovery. Parties are directed to file any additional/ revised motions for protective order by next Monday; oral argument will occur on Monday, November 25th at 9:00 AM unless the motion is resolved by parties prior. (Court Reporter Wynette Blathers) (jed) Modified on 10/23/2019 to change discovery from 10/30 to 10/31 (jkl).
October 22, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Kyle Reed on behalf of FMW RRI NC, LLC, Red Roof Inns, Inc., SUB-SU Hotel GP, LLC, WHG SU Atlanta LP, Westmont Hospitality Group, Inc. (Reed, Charles)
October 22, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles K. Reed on behalf of FMW RRI NC, LLC, Red Roof Inns, Inc., SUB-SU Hotel GP, LLC, WHG SU Atlanta LP, Westmont Hospitality Group, Inc. (Freed, P.) Modified on 10/23/2019 to edit text (rlb).
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER regarding #63 Defendant Choice Hotels International, Inc.'s Motion for Leave. The hearing on the pending Motion for Protective Order and Motion for More Definite Statement will stay on the calendar as originally scheduled. The Court is willing for counsel to arrange with the technology personnel at the Court such that Attorney Turner can appear telephonically to listen in on the hearing, but any argument made on behalf of Defendant Choice Hotels International, Inc. must be made by local counsel who will be present in the courtroom. The Court remains willing to reschedule the hearing to eitherMonday, October 21, 2019 or Tuesday October 22, 2019, if that willaccommodate Attorney Turners appearance. If counsel for the parties can agree to an alternative time on either of these dates, counsel should immediately notify the Court. Absent notification that the parties have agreed to move the date and time of the hearing, it will remain as scheduled. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/17/19. (ddm)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting the parties' #64 Consent Motion to Extinguish and Extend Current Case Deadlines. Defendants are granted an extension to respond to the pleadings in this case, specifically including the Complaint and any Amended Complaint, such response or Answer which must be made within 14 days after service of the Amended Complaint. The date on which the Plaintiff will have to file its amended Complaint will be set at the hearing held on the pending motions, such hearing which is currently scheduled for October 23, 2019. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/17/19. (ddm)
October 16, 2019 Filing 64 Consent MOTION To Extinguish And Extend Current Case Deadlines By Plaintiff and by BRE/LQ Properties, LLC, CPLG Properties, LLC, Choice Hotels International, Inc., ESA Management, LLC, ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee, LLC, ESA P Portfolio, LLC, Extended Stay America, Inc., FMW RRI NC, LLC, LQ Properties, LLC, La Quinta Worldwide, LLC, Red Roof Inns, Inc., SUB-SU Hotel GP, LLC, Varahi Hotel, LLC, WHG SU Atlanta LP, Westmont Hospitality Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order To Extinguish And Extend Current Case Deadlines)(Frazier, Delia)
October 16, 2019 Filing 63 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Attend October 23, 2019 Hearing Telephonically, or in the alternative, Motion to Postpone Hearing to a Later Date by Choice Hotels International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alleyne, Janelle)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #61 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff's deadline to amend her complaint as a matter of course as to all Defendants is extended to twenty-one days after the last Defendant files a responsive pleading to the complaint or a motion under Rule 12(b), (e), or (f). Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/15/19. (ddm)
October 14, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION for Extension of Time Amend Complaint with Brief In Support by Jane Doe 1. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time)(Tonge, Jonathan)
October 11, 2019 Filing 60 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION Protective Order; Leave to Proceed Anonymously filed by Jane Doe 1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Tonge, Jonathan)
October 10, 2019 Filing 59 RESPONSE re #17 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION Protective Order; Leave to Proceed Anonymously filed by ESA Management, LLC, ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee, LLC, ESA P Portfolio, LLC, Extended Stay America, Inc.. (Adams, Emily)
October 10, 2019 Filing 58 RESPONSE re #44 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Jane Doe 1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Herrera Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2- Herrera Answers, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3- Discrediting Victims Allegationss)(Tonge, Jonathan)
October 9, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to David S. Sager re #57 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rlb)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #52 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for David S. Sager. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/9/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rlb)
October 8, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #52 APPLICATION for Admission of David S. Sager Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8977722). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney David S. Sager added appearing on behalf of CPLG Properties, LLC, LQ Properties, LLC, La Quinta Worldwide, LLC (pmb)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Amended Order Setting Hearing on #17 Motion for Protective Order and Leave to Proceed Anonymously and #44 and Motion for More Definite Statement for Wednesday, October 23, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. (previous time was 9:30 a.m.)in ATLA Courtroom 1705 before Judge William M. Ray II. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/8/19. (rlb) Modified on 10/8/2019 to edit text (rlb).
October 4, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Marie Adams on behalf of ESA Management, LLC, ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee, LLC, ESA P Portfolio, LLC, Extended Stay America, Inc. (Adams, Emily)
October 3, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Thomas Byrd on behalf of ESA Management, LLC, ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee, LLC, ESA P Portfolio, LLC, Extended Stay America, Inc. (Byrd, Christopher)
October 3, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Shubhra R. Mashelkar on behalf of ESA Management, LLC, ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee, LLC, ESA P Portfolio, LLC, Extended Stay America, Inc. (Mashelkar, Shubhra)
October 2, 2019 Filing 52 APPLICATION for Admission of David S. Sager Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8977722). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by CPLG Properties, LLC, LQ Properties, LLC, La Quinta Worldwide, LLC. (Frazier, Delia)
October 2, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Sara Turner re #51 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rlb)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #41 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Sara Turner. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/2/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rlb)
October 1, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #41 APPLICATION for Admission of Sara Turner Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8960544). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Sara Marie Turner added appearing on behalf of Choice Hotels International, Inc. (pmb)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Order Granting Stipulation and Order Vacating Clerk's Entry of Default. The Clerk shall vacate the Entry of Default as to the CPLG Defendants, and the CPLG Defendants' responsive pleadings to Plaintiffs Complaint shall be due on October 31, 2019 re #49 Stipulation Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/1/19. (rlb)
September 30, 2019 Filing 49 STIPULATION re Clerks Entry of Default by BRE/LQ Properties, LLC, CPLG Properties, LLC, LQ Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulation and Order Vacating Clerk's Entry of Default)(Frazier, Delia)
September 30, 2019 ---Vacated Per Order #50 ---Clerks Entry of Default as to BRE/LQ Properties, LLC, CPLG Properties, LLC and LQ Properties, LLC (rlb) Modified on 10/1/2019 to edit text (rlb).
September 27, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default with Brief In Support by Jane Doe 1. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Jonathan Tonge)(Tonge, Jonathan)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, La Quinta Worldwide, LLC responsive pleading shall be due on October 31, 2019. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 9/27/19. (rlb)
September 26, 2019 Filing 46 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by La Quinta Worldwide, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time)(Frazier, Delia)
September 26, 2019 Filing 45 Certificate of Interested Persons by ESA Management, LLC, ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee, LLC, ESA P Portfolio, LLC, Extended Stay America, Inc.. (Moore, Patrick)
September 26, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION for More Definite Statement with Brief In Support by ESA Management, LLC, ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee, LLC, ESA P Portfolio, LLC, Extended Stay America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Moore, Patrick)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Choice's time to answer, object or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is hereby extended up to and including Thursday, October 31, 2019. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 9/26/19. (rlb)
September 25, 2019 Filing 42 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Choice Hotels International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Alleyne, Janelle)
September 25, 2019 Filing 41 APPLICATION for Admission of Sara Turner Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8960544). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Choice Hotels International, Inc.. (Alleyne, Janelle)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Red Roof Inns, Inc., FMW RRI NC, LLC, Westmont Hospitality Group, Inc., WHG SU Atlanta, LP, and Sub-SU Hotel GP, LLC's time to answer shall be extended through and including October 17, 2019. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 9/23/19. (rlb)
September 23, 2019 Filing 39 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by FMW RRI NC, LLC, Red Roof Inns, Inc., SUB-SU Hotel GP, LLC, WHG SU Atlanta LP, Westmont Hospitality Group, Inc.. (Allushi, Admir)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. the time in which Varahi may answer, object or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is hereby extended up to and including Friday, October 18, 2019. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 9/20/19. (rlb)
September 19, 2019 Filing 37 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, (Varahi Hotel, LLC only) by Varahi Hotel, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Keith, Christopher)
September 18, 2019 Filing 36 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe 1. Westmont Hospitality Group, Inc. served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Tonge, Jonathan)
September 18, 2019 Submission of #17 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION Protective Order; Leave to Proceed Anonymously , to District Judge William M. Ray II. (rlb)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Setting Hearing on #17 Motion for Protective Order and Leave to Proceed Anonymously for Wednesday, October 23, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. in ATLA Courtroom 1705 before Judge William M. Ray II. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 9/12/19. (rlb)
September 11, 2019 Filing 34 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe 1. La Quinta Worldwide, LLC served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (Tonge, Jonathan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 33 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe 1. CPLG Properties, LLC served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Tonge, Jonathan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 32 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe 1. Red Roof Inns, Inc. served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Tonge, Jonathan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 31 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe 1. WHG SU Atlanta LP served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Tonge, Jonathan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 30 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe 1. ESA Management, LLC served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Tonge, Jonathan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 29 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe 1. ESA P Portfolio, LLC served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Tonge, Jonathan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 28 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe 1. ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee, LLC served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Tonge, Jonathan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 27 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe 1. Varahi Hotel, LLC served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Tonge, Jonathan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 26 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe 1. LQ Properties, LLC served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Tonge, Jonathan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 25 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe 1. BRE/LQ Properties, LLC served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Tonge, Jonathan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 24 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe 1. FMW RRI NC, LLC served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Tonge, Jonathan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 23 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe 1. Choice Hotels International, Inc. served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Tonge, Jonathan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 22 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe 1. Extended Stay America, Inc. served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Tonge, Jonathan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 21 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe 1. SUB-SU Hotel GP, LLC served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Tonge, Jonathan)
September 3, 2019 Clerks Notation re #18 Certificate of Interested Persons - OK per WMR (sll)
August 30, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Trinity Hundredmark on behalf of Jane Doe 1 (Hundredmark, Trinity)
August 30, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J. McDonough on behalf of Jane Doe 1 (McDonough, Patrick)
August 30, 2019 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Persons by Jane Doe 1. (Tonge, Jonathan)
August 30, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Protective Order , MOTION Protective Order; Leave to Proceed Anonymously with Brief In Support by Jane Doe 1. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Motion for Protective Order and Leave to Proceed Anonymously)(Tonge, Jonathan)
August 26, 2019 Filing 16 Electronic Summons Issued as to ESA P Portfolio, LLC. (eop)
August 26, 2019 Filing 15 Electronic Summons Issued as to ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee, LLC. (eop)
August 26, 2019 Filing 14 Electronic Summons Issued as to ESA Management, LLC. (eop)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 Electronic Summons Issued as to Extended Stay America, Inc.. (eop)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 Electronic Summons Issued as to La Quinta Worldwide, LLC. (eop)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 Electronic Summons Issued as to BRE/LQ Properties, LLC. (eop)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 Electronic Summons Issued as to CPLG Properties, LLC. (eop)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 Electronic Summons Issued as to LQ Properties, LLC. (eop)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 Electronic Summons Issued as to Choice Hotels International, Inc.. (eop)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to SUB-SU Hotel GP, LLC. (eop)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to WHG SU Atlanta LP. (eop)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Westmont Hospitality Group, Inc.. (eop)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to FMW RRI NC, LLC. (eop)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Varahi Hotel, LLC. (eop)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Red Roof Inns, Inc.. (eop)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jane Doe 1. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8889887) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1 -Westmont website, #2 Exhibit -2 -Maxwell article, #3 Exhibit -3 -Hickson article, #4 Exhibit -4 -Hansen series, #5 Exhibit -5 - Red Roof reviews, #6 Exhibit -6 - Red Roof website, #7 Exhibit -7 -No refund review, #8 Exhibit -8 -Red Roofie blog, #9 Exhibit -9 -Red Roof website overview, #10 Exhibit -10 -SES reviews, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jane Doe 1 v. Red Roof Inns, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choice Hotels International, Inc.
Represented By: Sara Marie Turner
Represented By: Janelle E. Alleyne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Roof Inns, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Kyle Reed
Represented By: Admir Allushi
Represented By: P. Michael Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRE/LQ Properties, LLC
Represented By: Delia Gervin Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Varahi Hotel, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Shane Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUB-SU Hotel GP, LLC
Represented By: Charles Kyle Reed
Represented By: Admir Allushi
Represented By: P. Michael Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHG SU Atlanta LP
Represented By: Charles Kyle Reed
Represented By: Admir Allushi
Represented By: P. Michael Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Byrd
Represented By: Patrick B. Moore
Represented By: Emily Marie Adams
Represented By: Shubhra R. Mashelkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMW RRI NC, LLC
Represented By: Charles Kyle Reed
Represented By: Admir Allushi
Represented By: P. Michael Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westmont Hospitality Group, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Kyle Reed
Represented By: Admir Allushi
Represented By: P. Michael Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPLG Properties, LLC
Represented By: David S. Sager
Represented By: Delia Gervin Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESA P Portfolio, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Byrd
Represented By: Patrick B. Moore
Represented By: Emily Marie Adams
Represented By: Shubhra R. Mashelkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Extended Stay America, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Byrd
Represented By: Patrick B. Moore
Represented By: Emily Marie Adams
Represented By: Shubhra R. Mashelkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESA Management, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Byrd
Represented By: Patrick B. Moore
Represented By: Emily Marie Adams
Represented By: Shubhra R. Mashelkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LQ Properties, LLC
Represented By: David S. Sager
Represented By: Delia Gervin Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Quinta Worldwide, LLC
Represented By: David S. Sager
Represented By: Delia Gervin Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 1
Represented By: Patrick J. McDonough
Represented By: Trinity Hundredmark
Represented By: Jonathan Tonge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?