Jane Doe 2 v. Red Roof Inns, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 2
Defendant: Choice Hotels International, Inc., John Does 1-10, Red Roof Inns, Inc., BRE/LQ Properties, LLC, Varahi Hotel, LLC, SUB-SU Hotel GP, LLC, WHG SU Atlanta LP, ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee, LLC, FMW RRI NC, LLC, Westmont Hospitality Group, Inc., CPLG Properties, LLC, ESA P Portfolio, LLC, Extended Stay America, Inc., ESA Management, LLC, LQ Properties, LLC and La Quinta Worldwide, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03841
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 18:1589
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Kyle Reed on behalf of FMW RRI NC, LLC, Red Roof Inns, Inc., SUB-SU Hotel GP, LLC, WHG SU Atlanta LP (Reed, Charles)
October 22, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by P. Michael Freed on behalf of FMW RRI NC, LLC, Red Roof Inns, Inc., SUB-SU Hotel GP, LLC, WHG SU Atlanta LP, Westmont Hospitality Group, Inc. (Freed, P.)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER - The motion to adopt and motion for joinder in the earlier-filed response of La Quinta Worldwide, LLC, LQ Properties, LLC, CPLG Properties, LLC, & BRE/LQ Properties, LLC [Doc. Nos. #56 , #59 ] are GRANTED. The plaintiff has moved to reassign this action as related to an earlier filed action, Jane Doe 1 v. Red Roof Inns, Inc. et al.; No. 1:19-CV-3840-WMR (N.D. Ga., August 26, 2019). However, the clerk of court has determined that the cases are not related as defined by this courts Internal Operating Procedures. Accordingly, the motion to reassign [Doc. No. #37 ] is DENIED. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 10/22/2019. (tcc)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting the #51 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for David S. Sager signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 10/18/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(aaq)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting the #40 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Sara Turner signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 10/18/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(aaq)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER DEEMING AS MOOT Plaintiff's #61 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint. Per the #63 Order, Plaintiff shall have up through and including November 21, 2019, to file her amended complaint and Defendants shall have 21 days thereafter to respond. Entered by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 10/18/2019. (mam)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER - Before the Court is the #62 consent motion of the Parties to extinguish and extend the current case deadlines. The Court concludes that good cause exists to GRANT the Parties' motion as follows: a. All current deadlines for Defendants' responsive pleadings are extinguished; b. Plaintiff shall have up through and including November 21, 2019, to file her amended complaint; and c. Defendants shall then have twenty-one (21) days to respond to Plaintiff's amended complaint. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 10/17/2019. (tcc)
October 16, 2019 Filing 62 Consent MOTION To Extinguish And Extend Current Case Deadlines by Plaintiff and by BRE/LQ Properties, LLC, CPLG Properties, LLC, Choice Hotels International, Inc., ESA Management, LLC, ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee, LLC, ESA P Portfolio, LLC, Extended Stay America, Inc., FMW RRI NC, LLC, LQ Properties, LLC, La Quinta Worldwide, LLC, Red Roof Inns, Inc., SUB-SU Hotel GP, LLC, WHG SU Atlanta LP, Westmont Hospitality Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order To Extinguish And Extend Current Case Deadlines)(Frazier, Delia)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Defendants are DIRECTED to file their respective responses to Plaintiff's #61 Motion for Extension of Time Amend Complaint by October 23, 2019. Entered by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 10/16/2019. (acm)
October 14, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION for Extension of Time Amend Complaint with Brief In Support by Jane Doe 2. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time)(Tonge, Jonathan)
October 11, 2019 Filing 60 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION Protective Order; Leave to Proceed Anonymously filed by Jane Doe 2. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Tonge, Jonathan)
October 10, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION for Joinder in Defendants La Quinta Worldwide, LLC, LQ Properties, LLC, CPLG Properties, LLC & BRE/LQ Properties, LLC to Plaintiff's Motion to Reassign Related Case by ESA Management, LLC, ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee, LLC, ESA P Portfolio, LLC, Extended Stay America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Reassign Related Case)(Adams, Emily)
October 10, 2019 Filing 58 RESPONSE re #17 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION Protective Order; Leave to Proceed Anonymously filed by ESA Management, LLC, ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee, LLC, ESA P Portfolio, LLC, Extended Stay America, Inc.. (Adams, Emily)
October 10, 2019 Filing 57 RESPONSE re #42 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Jane Doe 2. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Herrera Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2- Herrera Answers, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3- Discrediting Victims Allegationss)(Tonge, Jonathan)
October 8, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #51 APPLICATION for Admission of David S. Sager Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8977809). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney David S. Sager added appearing on behalf of CPLG Properties, LLC, LQ Properties, LLC, La Quinta Worldwide, LLC (pmb)
October 7, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION to Adopt #52 Response to Motion filed by Choice Hotels International, Inc.. (Alleyne, Janelle)
October 4, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Marie Adams on behalf of ESA Management, LLC, ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee, LLC, ESA P Portfolio, LLC, Extended Stay America, Inc. (Adams, Emily)
October 3, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Thomas Byrd on behalf of ESA Management, LLC, ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee, LLC, ESA P Portfolio, LLC, Extended Stay America, Inc. (Byrd, Christopher)
October 3, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Shubhra R. Mashelkar on behalf of ESA Management, LLC, ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee, LLC, ESA P Portfolio, LLC, Extended Stay America, Inc. (Mashelkar, Shubhra)
October 2, 2019 Filing 52 RESPONSE re #37 MOTION to Reassign Case filed by BRE/LQ Properties, LLC, CPLG Properties, LLC, LQ Properties, LLC, La Quinta Worldwide, LLC. (Frazier, Delia)
October 2, 2019 Filing 51 APPLICATION for Admission of David S. Sager Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8977809). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by CPLG Properties, LLC, LQ Properties, LLC, La Quinta Worldwide, LLC. (Frazier, Delia)
October 1, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #40 APPLICATION for Admission of Sara Turner Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8960577). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Sara Marie Turner added appearing on behalf of Choice Hotels International, Inc. (pmb)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #49 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. The CLPG Defendants' responsive pleading shall be due on October 31, 2019. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 10/1/2019. (tcc)
September 30, 2019 Filing 49 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by BRE/LQ Properties, LLC, CPLG Properties, LLC, LQ Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Amended Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time)(Frazier, Delia)
September 30, 2019 Filing 48 Withdrawal of Motion #47 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default filed by Jane Doe 2 filed by Jane Doe 2. (Tonge, Jonathan)
September 27, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default with Brief In Support by Jane Doe 2. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Jonathan Tonge)(Tonge, Jonathan)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #44 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, La Quinta Worldwide, LLC Answer due 10/31/2019. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 9/27/2019. (tcc)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Choice Hotels International, Inc. Answer due 10/31/2019. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 9/27/2019. (tcc)
September 26, 2019 Filing 44 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by La Quinta Worldwide, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time)(Frazier, Delia)
September 26, 2019 Filing 43 Certificate of Interested Persons by ESA Management, LLC, ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee, LLC, ESA P Portfolio, LLC, Extended Stay America, Inc.. (Moore, Patrick)
September 26, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for More Definite Statement with Brief In Support by ESA Management, LLC, ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee, LLC, ESA P Portfolio, LLC, Extended Stay America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Moore, Patrick)
September 25, 2019 Filing 41 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Choice Hotels International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Alleyne, Janelle)
September 25, 2019 Filing 40 APPLICATION for Admission of Sara Turner Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8960577). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Choice Hotels International, Inc.. (Alleyne, Janelle)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, FMW RRI NC, LLC, Red Roof Inns, Inc., SUB-SU Hotel GP, LLC, WHG SU Atlanta LP and Westmont Hospitality Group, Inc. Answers due 10/17/2019. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 9/25/2019. (tcc)
September 23, 2019 Filing 38 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by FMW RRI NC, LLC, Red Roof Inns, Inc., SUB-SU Hotel GP, LLC, WHG SU Atlanta LP, Westmont Hospitality Group, Inc.. (Allushi, Admir)
September 19, 2019 Submission of #17 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION Protective Order; Leave to Proceed Anonymously , to District Judge Charles A. Pannell Jr.. (tcc)
September 18, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Reassign Case with Brief In Support by Jane Doe 2. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Reassign Related Cases)(Tonge, Jonathan)
September 18, 2019 Filing 36 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe 2. Westmont Hospitality Group, Inc. served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Tonge, Jonathan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 35 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe 2. La Quinta Worldwide, LLC served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (Tonge, Jonathan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 34 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe 2. LQ Properties, LLC served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Tonge, Jonathan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 33 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe 2. WHG SU Atlanta LP served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Tonge, Jonathan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 32 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe 2. ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee, LLC served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Tonge, Jonathan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 31 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe 2. ESA P Portfolio, LLC served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Tonge, Jonathan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 30 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe 2. ESA Management, LLC served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Tonge, Jonathan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 29 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe 2. BRE/LQ Properties, LLC served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Tonge, Jonathan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 28 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe 2. Red Roof Inns, Inc. served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Tonge, Jonathan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 27 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe 2. FMW RRI NC, LLC served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Tonge, Jonathan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 26 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe 2. Varahi Hotel, LLC served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Tonge, Jonathan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 25 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe 2. Choice Hotels International, Inc. served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Tonge, Jonathan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 24 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe 2. CPLG Properties, LLC served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Tonge, Jonathan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 23 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe 2. Extended Stay America, Inc. served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Tonge, Jonathan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 22 Return of Service Executed by Jane Doe 2. SUB-SU Hotel GP, LLC served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Tonge, Jonathan)
August 30, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Trinity Hundredmark on behalf of Jane Doe 2 (Hundredmark, Trinity)
August 30, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J. McDonough on behalf of Jane Doe 2 (McDonough, Patrick)
August 30, 2019 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Persons by Jane Doe 2. (Tonge, Jonathan)
August 30, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Protective Order , MOTION Protective Order; Leave to Proceed Anonymously with Brief In Support by Jane Doe 2. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Motion for Protective Order and Leave to Proceed Anonymously)(Tonge, Jonathan)
August 26, 2019 Filing 21 Electronic Summons Issued as to BRE/LQ Properties, LLC. (sap)
August 26, 2019 Filing 16 Electronic Summons Issued as to ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee, LLC. (eop)
August 26, 2019 Filing 15 Electronic Summons Issued as to ESA P Portfolio, LLC. (eop)
August 26, 2019 Filing 14 Electronic Summons Issued as to ESA Management, LLC. (eop)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 Electronic Summons Issued as to Extended Stay America, Inc.. (eop)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 Electronic Summons Issued as to La Quinta Worldwide, LLC. (eop)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 (WRONG PDF ATTACHED; ENTRY CORRECTED AT #21 ) Electronic Summons Issued as to BRE/LQ Properties, LLC. (eop) Modified on 9/3/2019 (sap).
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 Electronic Summons Issued as to CPLG Properties, LLC. (eop)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 Electronic Summons Issued as to LQ Properties, LLC. (eop)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 Electronic Summons Issued as to Choice Hotels International, Inc.. (eop)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to SUB-SU Hotel GP, LLC. (eop)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to WHG SU Atlanta LP. (eop)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Westmont Hospitality Group, Inc.. (eop)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to FMW RRI NC, LLC. (eop)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Varahi Hotel, LLC. (eop)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Red Roof Inns, Inc.. (eop)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jane Doe 2. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8890104) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1 -Westmont website, #2 Exhibit -2 -Maxwell Article, #3 Exhibit -3 -Hickson Article, #4 Exhibit -4 -Hansen Series, #5 Exhibit -5 - Red Roof reviews, #6 Exhibit -6 - Red Roof website, #7 Exhibit -7 -No Refund review, #8 Exhibit -8 -Red Roofie blog, #9 Exhibit -9 -Red Roof website overview, #10 Exhibit -10 -SES reviews, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jane Doe 2 v. Red Roof Inns, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choice Hotels International, Inc.
Represented By: Sara Marie Turner
Represented By: Janelle E. Alleyne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Roof Inns, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Kyle Reed
Represented By: Admir Allushi
Represented By: P. Michael Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRE/LQ Properties, LLC
Represented By: Delia Gervin Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Varahi Hotel, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUB-SU Hotel GP, LLC
Represented By: Charles Kyle Reed
Represented By: Admir Allushi
Represented By: P. Michael Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHG SU Atlanta LP
Represented By: Charles Kyle Reed
Represented By: Admir Allushi
Represented By: P. Michael Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESA P Portfolio Operating Lessee, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Byrd
Represented By: Patrick B. Moore
Represented By: Emily Marie Adams
Represented By: Shubhra R. Mashelkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMW RRI NC, LLC
Represented By: Charles Kyle Reed
Represented By: Admir Allushi
Represented By: P. Michael Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westmont Hospitality Group, Inc.
Represented By: Admir Allushi
Represented By: P. Michael Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPLG Properties, LLC
Represented By: David S. Sager
Represented By: Delia Gervin Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESA P Portfolio, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Byrd
Represented By: Patrick B. Moore
Represented By: Emily Marie Adams
Represented By: Shubhra R. Mashelkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Extended Stay America, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Byrd
Represented By: Patrick B. Moore
Represented By: Emily Marie Adams
Represented By: Shubhra R. Mashelkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESA Management, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Byrd
Represented By: Patrick B. Moore
Represented By: Emily Marie Adams
Represented By: Shubhra R. Mashelkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LQ Properties, LLC
Represented By: David S. Sager
Represented By: Delia Gervin Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Quinta Worldwide, LLC
Represented By: David S. Sager
Represented By: Delia Gervin Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 2
Represented By: Patrick J. McDonough
Represented By: Trinity Hundredmark
Represented By: Jonathan Tonge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?