1250 West LLC v. Hampton
Plaintiff: 1250 West LLC
Defendant: Shannon Hampton
Case Number: 1:2019cv03850
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Justin S Anand
Referring Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation and #6 Remand Letter to Shannon Hampton (Certified copies of #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation mailed to Cobb Magistrate Court). (adg)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 Remand Letter to Cobb County Magistrate Court (adg)
September 17, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (adg)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER APPROVING and ADOPTING the #3 Final Report and Recommendation as the judgment of the Court. The action is REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Cobb County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 9/17/2019. (adg)
August 29, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Shannon Hampton re #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removal, filed by Shannon Hampton, #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (adg)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 8/29/2019. (adg)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that this action be REMANDED to the MagistrateCourt of Cobb County re #2 Notice of Removal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 8/29/2019. (adg)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT, filed by Shannon Hampton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER GRANTING #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 8/29/2019. (adg)
August 28, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (tcc)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shannon Hampton. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 1250 West LLC v. Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1250 West LLC
Represented By: David Richard Passino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?