CCA and B, LLC v. Babeeni Vietnam Company Limited et al
Plaintiff: CCA and B, LLC
Defendant: Joys of Toy Store, Clelo, TOLOCO mascot Store, Men'S -World Store, Tshirtstar, Purlove, Guangzhou Bollair Outdoor Product Co., Ltd., Shop4658058 Store, Xiamen Jinmao Sacarla Fashion Accessories Co., Ltd., QFTshirt Store, jingju, Babeeni Vietnam Company Limited, Bbgames, Dongguan Brother Inflatable Co., Ltd., Cuscosplay funny costumes Store, Guangzhou18, Coser World Store, Goodgoods_2017, Bestselling Store, Culturepress, hk_bonroy, Sportsun, Tljcathy, wushaoqi Store, FancyExpress Store, Henan YZ Amusement Equipment Co., Ltd., vanilla12, TALOCO Store, bingquanwat, Shantou Nanshen Crafts Industry Co., Ltd., kingsale, Goodgoods_2013, Evvk8889, MatouGui Store, Spinnertoys, lijian Store, CosplayDreamland Store, Cuscosplay Funny Store, Pro_watches_mfr, Dongguan Kinshun Packing Materials Co., Ltd., Ehanking, Ningbo Rozi Trading Co., Ltd., Yiwu Libang E-Commerce Co., Ltd., party cosplayers Store, TTANGBO costume Store, Topgrow, cos clothings Store, Cuscosplay circus Store, mascot Store and TTANGBO 007 Store
Case Number: 1:2019cv03859
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #22 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendants Bbgames, Ehanking, Goodgoods_2013, Goodgoods 2017, Pro watches mfr, and Topgrow, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (ddm)
October 22, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by CCA and B, LLC (Seigel, Mark)
October 22, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #21 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant TTANGBO 007 pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (ddm)
October 21, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by CCA and B, LLC (Seigel, Mark)
October 2, 2019 Notification of Docket Correction re #15 Motion Hearing. Corrected minutes attached. (bnw)
September 25, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #20 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendants Ehanking, Bbgames, goodgoods 2013, goodgoods 2017, pro watches mfr, topgrow, guangzhou18, cello, spinnertoys, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (ddm)
September 24, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by CCA and B, LLC (Seigel, Mark)
September 24, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #18 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant TTANGBO 007 Store pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (ddm)
September 23, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by CCA and B, LLC re #15 Motion Hearing, regarding the reduction of TRO bond (Cooper, Jason)
September 23, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by CCA and B, LLC (Seigel, Mark)
September 23, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #14 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to CosplayDreamland Store pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (ddm)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting Plaintiff CCA AND B, LLC's #3 Motion for Authorization to Serve Process on Defendants by Electronic Means Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(f)(3). Pursuant to Rule 4(f)(3), Plaintiff is authorized to serve the Summons, Complaint, Temporary Restraining Order ("TRO") and all subsequent pleadings and other documents on Defendants in this action as follows: 1) By notifying Defendants of the pending suit using a Marketplace messaging system where available, and including a hyperlink to directly download the Summons, Complaint and TRO where possible; and 2) By sending copies of the Summons, Complaint, TRO and all related and subsequent documents to Defendants: a) Attached to a message sent to Defendants through a Marketplace messaging system where possible; or b) By electronic mail with delivery confirmation using email addresses provided by the Marketplaces, Financial Institutions or Defendants themselves. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 9/20/2019. (tcc)
September 20, 2019 Filing 16 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 9/20/2019. (tcc)
September 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by CCA and B, LLC (Seigel, Mark)
September 19, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. P. Boulee: Hearing held on Plaintiff's preliminary injunction. No Defendants present. Plaintiff produced proposed order for preliminary injunction to the Court. TRO Order to remain in effect pending the entry of the Court's order on preliminary injunction. Plaintiff moved to reduce TRO bond. The Court requested a brief on the reduction of TRO bond. See transcript for more details. (Court Reporter Shannon Welch)(ddm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2019: #2 Corrected Minutes) (bnw).
September 16, 2019 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed by CCA and B, LLC. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Seigel, Mark)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend, to September 24, 2019, the Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order, Asset Freeze Order and Order to Show Cause. The hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction is rescheduled and set before the Court for September 19, 2019 at 3:00 P.M., at which time Defendants and/or any other affected persons may challenge the appropriateness of the TRO and move to dissolve the same and shall appear and show cause why a preliminary injunction should not issue. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 9/10/19. (ddm)
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time for TRO and to Conduct Hearing on Motion for Order to Show Cause re: #9 Order on Motion for TRO,, with Brief In Support by CCA and B, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion, #2 Affidavit of Mark L. Seigel, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Seigel, Mark)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 Temporary Restraining Order Bond filed by CCA and B, LLC. (ddm)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion for TRO. A hearing is set before this Court in the United States Courthouse located at 75 Ted Turner Drive NW, Atlanta, Georgia 30303, Courtroom 2307, on the 11th day of September, 2019 at 10:00 A.M. Any response or opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction must be filed and served on Plaintiff's counsel by September 9, 2019,and filed with the Court, along with Proof of Service. Plaintiff shall file any reply memorandum prior to the hearing set for September 11, 2019. The above dates may be revised upon stipulation by all parties and approval of this Court. SEE ORDER FOR MORE DETAILS. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/30/19. (bnw)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/27/19. (bnw)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons, #28 Summons, #29 Summons, #30 Summons, #31 Summons, #32 Summons, #33 Summons, #34 Summons, #35 Summons, #36 Summons, #37 Summons, #38 Summons, #39 Summons, #40 Summons, #41 Summons, #42 Summons, #43 Summons, #44 Summons, #45 Summons, #46 Summons, #47 Summons, #48 Summons, #49 Summons)(ddm)
August 27, 2019 Submission of #2 MOTION for Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order, Asset Freeze Order, and Order to Show Cause, #3 MOTION for Authorization to Serve Process on Defendants by Electronic Means pursuant to Rule 4(f)(3), to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (ddm)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by CCA and B, LLC. (ddm)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (ddm)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (ddm)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Authorization to Serve Process on Defendants by Electronic Means pursuant to Rule 4(f)(3) filed by CCA and B, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ddm)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order, Asset Freeze Order, and Order to Show Cause filed by CCA and B, LLC. IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Champion Affidavit, #3 McCarthy Affidavit, #4 Sladkus Affidavit, #5 Exh. A to Sladkus Affidavit, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Exh. A to Proposed Order)(ddm)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by CCA and B, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8892816) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibits B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Blank Summons)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CCA and B, LLC v. Babeeni Vietnam Company Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joys of Toy Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOLOCO mascot Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Men'S -World Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tshirtstar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guangzhou Bollair Outdoor Product Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop4658058 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiamen Jinmao Sacarla Fashion Accessories Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QFTshirt Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jingju
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Babeeni Vietnam Company Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bbgames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dongguan Brother Inflatable Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuscosplay funny costumes Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guangzhou18
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coser World Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodgoods_2017
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bestselling Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Culturepress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hk_bonroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sportsun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tljcathy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: wushaoqi Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FancyExpress Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henan YZ Amusement Equipment Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: vanilla12
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TALOCO Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: bingquanwat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shantou Nanshen Crafts Industry Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: kingsale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodgoods_2013
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evvk8889
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MatouGui Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spinnertoys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lijian Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CosplayDreamland Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuscosplay Funny Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro_watches_mfr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dongguan Kinshun Packing Materials Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ehanking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ningbo Rozi Trading Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yiwu Libang E-Commerce Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: party cosplayers Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TTANGBO costume Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Topgrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cos clothings Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuscosplay circus Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mascot Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TTANGBO 007 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CCA and B, LLC
Represented By: Mark Lawrence Seigel
Represented By: Jason Harris Cooper
Represented By: Jeffrey Brandon Sladkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?