Harris v. SunTrust Bank
Plaintiff: Andrew P. Harris
Defendant: SunTrust Bank
Case Number: 1:2019cv03866
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Catherine M Salinas
Referring Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Submission of #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and #3 MOTION to Require Mortgage Payments to be Paid into Court to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (sap)
September 23, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Andrew P. Harris re #9 Order on Motion to Stay. (sap)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Stay Discovery. The pre-trial deadlines for all parties and the discovery period are stayed in this case until the Court enters an order ruling on Defendant's pending #2 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 9/23/2019. (sap)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Suspend Rule 26 Disclosures and the Scheduling of Rule 26(F) Conference by SunTrust Bank. (Breithaupt, Eric)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION to Require Mortgage Payments to be Paid into Court filed by Andrew P. Harris. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rlb)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Andrew P. Harris. (rlb)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons by Andrew P. Harris. (sap)
September 6, 2019 Clerk's Notation re #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement: OK, per TWT. (cmd)
September 6, 2019 Notification of Docket Correction re #4 Certificate of Interested and Corporate Disclosure Statement: SunTrust Banks, Inc. added as a corporate parent. (sap)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by SunTrust Bank identifying Corporate Parent SunTrust Bank Holding Company and Corporate Parent SunTrust Banks, Inc. for SunTrust Bank.(Breithaupt, Eric) Modified on 9/6/2019 to add a corporate parent (sap).
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Require Mortgage Payments to be Paid into Court by SunTrust Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Breithaupt, Eric)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by SunTrust Bank. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief)(Breithaupt, Eric)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by SunTrust Bank. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-8893870) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A with Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. SunTrust Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew P. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Bank
Represented By: Eric Joseph Breithaupt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?