Levine v. American Mensa, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Barry Levine
Defendant: American Mensa, Ltd. and John Does 1-5
Case Number: 1:2019cv04023
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 the parties' Consent Motion to Extend Deadline, to November 18, 2019, for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/18/19. (ddm)
October 11, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #9 Amended Complaint,, by American Mensa, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Adler, Bradley)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying as moot #3 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 10/7/19. (ddm)
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE Of Filing by Barry Levine re #10 Response in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Barry Levine, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8)(Lubel, Alan)
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE Of Filing Declaration by Barry Levine re #10 Response in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Barry Levine)(Lubel, Alan)
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law filed by Barry Levine. (Lubel, Alan)
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Barry Levine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10)(Lubel, Alan) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting the parties' #7 Joint Motion for Extension of Time, through October 4, 2019, for Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 9/25/19. (ddm)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time File Response re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law by Barry Levine. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lubel, Alan)
September 20, 2019 Clerks Notation re #6 Certificate of Interested Persons approved by JPB. (bnw)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 Amended Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Barry Levine identifying Other Affiliate mensa international ltd, Other Affiliate Mensa In Georgia, Inc. for Barry Levine. (Lubel, Alan)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons by Barry Levine. (Lubel, Alan)
September 17, 2019 Clerks Notation re #4 and #5 Certificate of Interested Persons approved by JPB. (bnw)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Mensa, Ltd.. (Adler, Bradley)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law with Brief In Support by American Mensa, Ltd.. (Adler, Bradley)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 9/12/19. (bnw)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by American Mensa, Ltd.. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-8916707) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A-1 - Compalint, #2 Exhibit -A-2 -Case Filing Info Sheet, #3 Exhibit -A -3 -Plaintiff's Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit -A-4 -Order to Perfect Service, #5 Exhibit -A-5 - Waiver of Service, #6 Exhibit -A-6 - Plaintiff's Certificate of Service -2, #7 Exhibit -C-A-7 -Notice of Substitution, #8 Exhibit -B -Notice of Filing -NOR, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levine v. American Mensa, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Mensa, Ltd.
Represented By: William Edward Collins, Jr.
Represented By: Bradley T. Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Levine
Represented By: Alan E. Lubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?