J & J Sports Productions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Cassandra W. Pickard and Social Haven
Case Number: 1:2019cv04030
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(Reemsnyder, Ronald)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 Initial Disclosures by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment C, #3 Attachment D)(Reemsnyder, Ronald)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Cassandra W. Pickard. Discovery ends on 3/6/2020.(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. Cassandra W. Pickard served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE Of Filing Certificate of Compliance by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 9/16/19. (bnp)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (jed)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Cassandra W. Pickard. (jed)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8918025) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jed) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassandra W. Pickard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Haven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Richard S. Bruno
Represented By: Ronald David Reemsnyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?