Advanced Aerodynamics, LLC v. Westminster, Inc.
Plaintiff: Advanced Aerodynamics, LLC
Defendant: Westminster, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04054
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Advanced Aerodynamics, LLC by Advanced Aerodynamics, LLC.(Miller, Jonathan)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Advanced Aerodynamics, LLC. Westminster, Inc. served on 10/24/2019, answer due 11/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McDonough, James)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (jed)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Westminster, Inc. (jed)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Advanced Aerodynamics, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8922244) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (jed) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2019: #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (jed).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advanced Aerodynamics, LLC v. Westminster, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westminster, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanced Aerodynamics, LLC
Represented By: Travis Edward Lynch
Represented By: Jonathan Robert Miller
Represented By: James F. McDonough, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?