J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. H & H Hospitality, LLC et al
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Mindy Hall, Kevin J. Holt, Mindy Fortson, Randolph H. Hazelton and H & H Hospitality, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv04064
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Clarence Cooper
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Unexecuted by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. as to Mindy Hall. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
October 23, 2019 Clerks Entry of Default as to Kevin J. Holt. (dob)
October 23, 2019 Clerks Entry of Default as to Randolph H. Hazelton. (dob)
October 23, 2019 Clerks Entry of Default as to H & H Hospitality, LLC (dob)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Application for Clerk's Entry of Default Against H&H Hospitality, LLC d/b/a Cafe Circa, Kevin J. Holt and Randolph H. Hazelton)(Reemsnyder, Ronald)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. Kevin J. Holt served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. H & H Hospitality, LLC served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc.. Randolph H. Hazelton served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Reemsnyder, Ronald)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. (jed)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to H & H Hospitality, LLC, Mindy Hall, Randolph H. Hazelton, Kevin J. Holt. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Kevin Holt, #2 Summons for Randolph Hamilton, #3 Summons for Mindy Hall) (jed)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by J & J Sports Productions, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8923827) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jed) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. H & H Hospitality, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mindy Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin J. Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mindy Fortson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randolph H. Hazelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H & H Hospitality, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Richard S. Bruno
Represented By: Ronald David Reemsnyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?