Willis v. Davis et al
Plaintiff: Alicia Willis
Defendant: Nu-Rock Management Group, Inc. and Debbie Davis
Case Number: 1:2019cv04084
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Referring Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Alicia Willis re Case Assigned/Reassigned. (rlb)
October 2, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Alicia Willis re #4 Order. (jpa)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 9/26/19. (jpa)
September 17, 2019 Submission of #3 Complaint for frivolity review, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (rlb)
September 17, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Alicia Willis re Case Assigned/Reassigned,. (rlb)
September 16, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Steven D. Grimberg. Judge William M. Ray, II no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-CV-4084-SDG. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (rlb)
September 16, 2019 Submission of #3 Complaint for frivolity determination, to District Judge William M. Ray II. (rlb)
September 16, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Alicia Willis re #2 Order. (rlb)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by Alicia Willis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rlb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The matter is deferred to the District Judge for determination as to whether the filing is frivolous, including whether this Court has subject matter jurisdiction, and ought to be dismissed under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) along with any instructions to the parties regarding service and case management. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 9/16/19. (rlb)
September 13, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (tcc)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alicia Willis. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willis v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nu-Rock Management Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?