Dekomte de Temple, LLC v. U. S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Dekomte de Temple, LLC
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli and U. S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv04116
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Dekomte de Temple, LLC. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Garvish, Elizabeth)
October 9, 2019 Refund in the amount of $400.00 has been processed, effective 10/9/2019 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
October 2, 2019 Clerks Approval re #6 Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (mec)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-8930827. (Garvish, Elizabeth)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 9/17/19. (bnw)
September 17, 2019 Clerks Notation re #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement approved by JPB. (bnw)
September 17, 2019 Notification of Docket Correction re #1 COMPLAINT filed by Dekomte de Temple, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-8930968) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit -A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obt ain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified text and corrected plaintiff's name on 9/16/2019 (eop). (eop) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
September 16, 2019 NEFs regenerated for the #1 Complaint, #2 Electronic Summons Issued, #3 Electronic Summons Issued, and #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (aaq)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dekomte de Temple, LLC identifying Corporate Parent, Dekomte de Temple Kompensator-Technik (UK); Corporate Parent, W Capital, LLC; Other Affiliate, Dekomte de Temple GMBH (Germany); Other Affiliate, J L. Waterhouse Ltd. (UK); and Other Affiliate, Viola de Temple for Dekomte de Temple, LLC. (eop) Modified plaintiff's name on 9/16/2019 (eop).
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli. (eop)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to U. S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (eop)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Dekomte de Temple, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-8930968) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified text and corrected plaintiff's name on 9/16/2019 (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dekomte de Temple, LLC v. U. S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dekomte de Temple, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Leigh Anne Garvish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U. S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?