Holt v. Heath
Plaintiff: Valerie Holt
Defendant: Demeshia R. Heath
Case Number: 1:2019cv04168
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Walter E Johnson
Referring Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Demeshia R. Heath re #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation, #6 Letter. Return to Sender. Insufficient Address Unable to Forward. (tcc)
October 11, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Demeshia R. Heath, Valerie Holt re #5 Order, #6 Letter. (ddm)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 Letter the Magistrate Court of Fulton County regarding the remand of this action to their court. (ddm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/11/2019: #1 Envelope Receipt) (ddm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/11/2019: #2 Acceptance of Filing by Fulton County) (ddm).
October 10, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (ddm)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER adopting the #3 Final Report and Recommendation as the opinion and order of this court and remanding this case to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 10/10/19. (ddm)
October 7, 2019 Submission of #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removal, filed by Demeshia R. Heath, to District Judge Charles A. Pannell Jr.. (tcc)
September 19, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Valerie Holt re #4 Order for Service of Order and Final Report and Recommendation and #3 ORDER AND FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (klb)
September 19, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Demeshia R. Heath re #4 Order for Service of Order and Final Report and Recommendation and #3 ORDER AND FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (klb)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Order and Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 9/19/19. (klb)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - the undersigned GRANTS the Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs #1 for the limited purpose of remand, and RECOMMENDS this case be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County, Georgia. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 9/19/19. (klb)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Demeshia R. Heath. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(klb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis for the limited purpose of remand (found in text of Order and Final Report & Recommendation). Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 9/19/19. (klb)
September 18, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (eop)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Demeshia R. Heath. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holt v. Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demeshia R. Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?