IOU Central, Inc. v. Mason et al
Plaintiff: IOU Central, Inc.
Defendant: Sporty's Taphouse and Grill, Inc., Gatekeeper Services, LLC, Arbor Square II, LLC, Tarina L. Mason, Howard D. Mason, III, 1 Global Capital, LLC, League Services, LLC, Shoe Studio, LLC, Direct Capital Corporation, U.S. Bank, N.A., Sysco Cincinnati, LLC, EDS LLC and Stately Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv04202
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 39 Amended EMERGENCY MOTION for Leave Regarding #36 Emergency MOTION TO DEFER RULING ON MOTION TO DISMISS PER PENDING AMENDED COMPLAINT #28 MOTION to Dismiss as to #38 Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by IOU Central, Inc. (Wersant, Paul) Modified on 11/8/2019 to edit text(jed).
November 6, 2019 Filing 38 AMENDED COMPLAINT Corrected to Include Case No, which supersedes Doc 37 against All Defendants filed by IOU Central, Inc..(Wersant, Paul) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
November 6, 2019 Filing 37 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by IOU Central, Inc..(Wersant, Paul) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
November 5, 2019 Filing 36 Emergency MOTION TO DEFER RULING ON MOTION TO DISMISS PER PENDING AMENDED COMPLAINT #28 MOTION to Dismiss, Submission to District Judge with Brief In Support by IOU Central, Inc.. (Wersant, Paul)
November 4, 2019 Submission of the #28 MOTION to Dismiss to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (aaq)
October 31, 2019 Clerks Notation re #35 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb)
October 30, 2019 Filing 35 Certificate of Interested Persons by U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Krivo, Gregory)
October 30, 2019 Filing 34 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by U.S. Bank, N.A.. Discovery ends on 3/30/2020.(Krivo, Gregory) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 28, 2019 Clerks Entry of Default as to Gatekeeper Services, LLC and League Services, LLC (jed)
October 27, 2019 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default against Defendants League Services, LLC and Gatekeeper Services, LLC with Brief In Support by IOU Central, Inc.. (Wersant, Paul)
October 21, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Default as to Arbor Square II, LLC and Sporty's Taphouse and Grill, Inc. (jed)
October 18, 2019 Filing 32 Amended MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Defendants Sportys Taphouse and Grill, Inc. and Arbor Square II, LLC, superseding Motion [Doc 31] with Brief In Support by IOU Central, Inc.. (Wersant, Paul)
October 18, 2019 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default against Defendants Sportys Taphouse and Grill, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A. and Arbor Square II, LLC with Brief In Support by IOU Central, Inc.. (Wersant, Paul)
October 17, 2019 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default against Defendant Sysco with Brief In Support by IOU Central, Inc.. (Wersant, Paul)
October 17, 2019 Clerks Entry of Default as to Sysco Cincinnati, LLC (jed)
October 17, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Default as to Direct Capital Corporation, EDS LLC, Shoe Studio, LLC (jed)
October 16, 2019 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default against Defendants Shoe Studio, EDS and Direct Capital with Brief In Support by IOU Central, Inc.. (Wersant, Paul)
October 15, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss by Howard D. Mason, III, Tarina L. Mason. (tmf)
October 15, 2019 NEF regenerated for the #27 Suggestion of Bankruptcy. (aaq)
October 13, 2019 Filing 27 SUGGESTION of Bankruptcy filed by IOU Central, Inc. as to defendant 1 Global Capital, LLC only. (Wersant, Paul) Modified on 10/15/2019 (jed).
October 13, 2019 Filing 26 Return of Service Executed by IOU Central, Inc. served on 9/24/2019 answer due 10/15/2019. (Wersant, Paul) Modified on 10/15/2019 to edit service and due dates (jed).
October 13, 2019 Filing 25 Return of Service Executed by IOU Central, Inc.. Direct Capital Corporation served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Wersant, Paul)
October 13, 2019 Filing 24 Return of Service Executed by IOU Central, Inc.. Arbor Square II, LLC served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (Wersant, Paul)
October 13, 2019 Filing 23 Return of Service Executed by IOU Central, Inc.. Sysco Cincinnati, LLC served on 9/25/2019, answer due 10/16/2019. (Wersant, Paul)
October 13, 2019 Filing 22 Return of Service Executed by IOU Central, Inc.. Gatekeeper Services, LLC served on 10/4/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. (Wersant, Paul)
October 13, 2019 Filing 21 Return of Service Executed by IOU Central, Inc.. League Services, LLC served on 10/4/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. (Wersant, Paul)
October 13, 2019 Filing 20 Return of Service Executed by IOU Central, Inc.. U.S. Bank, N.A. served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (Wersant, Paul)
October 13, 2019 Filing 19 Return of Service Executed by IOU Central, Inc.. EDS LLC served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Wersant, Paul)
October 13, 2019 Filing 18 Return of Service Executed by IOU Central, Inc.. Sporty's Taphouse and Grill, Inc. served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (Wersant, Paul)
October 13, 2019 Filing 17 Return of Service Executed by IOU Central, Inc.. Shoe Studio, LLC served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Wersant, Paul)
October 13, 2019 Filing 16 Return of Service Executed by IOU Central, Inc.. Tarina L. Mason served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Wersant, Paul)
October 13, 2019 Filing 15 Return of Service Executed by IOU Central, Inc.. Howard D. Mason, III served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Wersant, Paul)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/24/2019. (tmf)
September 18, 2019 Filing 13 Electronic Summons Issued as to 1 Global Capital, LLC. (eop)
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 Electronic Summons Issued as to Direct Capital Corporation. (eop)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 Electronic Summons Issued as to Arbor Square II, LLC. (eop)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 Electronic Summons Issued as to Gatekeeper Services, LLC. (eop)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 Electronic Summons Issued as to Sysco Cincinnati, LLC. (eop)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 Electronic Summons Issued as to League Services, LLC. (eop)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to U.S. Bank, N.A.. (eop)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to EDS LLC. (eop)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Sporty's Taphouse and Grill, Inc.. (eop)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Shoe Studio, LLC. (eop)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Tarina L. Mason. (eop)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Howard D. Mason, III. (eop)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by IOU Central, Inc.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8942238) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IOU Central, Inc. v. Mason et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sporty's Taphouse and Grill, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gatekeeper Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arbor Square II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarina L. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard D. Mason, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1 Global Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: League Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shoe Studio, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Direct Capital Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Gregory Scott Krivo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sysco Cincinnati, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stately Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IOU Central, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Gerard Wersant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?