Segura et al v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Freddy Del Carmen Ceciliano and Joseline Villalobos Segura
Defendant: Denise M. Frazier, Attorney General William Barr, Kevin K. Mcaleenan and Kenneth Cuccinelli
Case Number: 1:2019cv04203
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Enlargement of Time. The time for filing Defendants' responsive pleading shall be enlarged through and including January 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 11/14/19. (rlb)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading with Brief In Support by William Barr, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Denise M. Frazier, Kevin K. Mcaleenan. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Lisa) Modified on 11/15/2019 to edit event type (bnp).
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. Re-filed at #5 . Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading with Brief In Support by William Barr, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Denise M. Frazier, Kevin K. Mcaleenan. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Melaine) Modified on 11/14/2019 to add error message per attorney's request and terminate motion (bnp).
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to William Barr as U.S. Attorney General, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Denise M. Frazier, Kevin K. Mcaleenan, and Byung J. Pak as U.S. Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Summons Kevin Mcaleenan, #2 Summons Denise Frazier, #3 Summons Kenneth Cuccinelli, #4 Summons Pak) (jed)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Mandamus Relief filed by Joseline Villalobos Segura and Freddy Del Carmen Ceciliano. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC- 8943145) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I-130 Notice, #2 Exhibit I-485 Notice, #3 Exhibit ASC Appt, #4 Exhibit Inter Docs, #5 Exhibit Processing Times, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (jed) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Segura et al v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise M. Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. Mcaleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddy Del Carmen Ceciliano
Represented By: Rebecca B. Rojas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseline Villalobos Segura
Represented By: Rebecca B. Rojas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?