Yarbrough et al v. Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Deloris B. Luke and Sonja S. Yarbrough
Defendant: Chase Bank, NA and Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv04210
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Alan J Baverman
Referring Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:l332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 19 Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Aaron Alan Wagner and John Michael Kearns replacing attorney Bret Jacob Chaness and Corey Tova Rothschild. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Consent to Substitution of Counsel)(Wagner, Aaron)
October 28, 2019 Submission of #11 NON-FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #13 MOTION to Amend to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (sap)
October 23, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief (Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss))(Chaness, Bret)
October 18, 2019 Submission of the #4 Order to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (aaq)
October 17, 2019 Filing 17 OBJECTION to the #11 Non-Final Report and Recommendation by Deloris B. Luke and Sonja S. Yarbrough. (rjs) Modified on 11/5/2019 (sap).
October 15, 2019 Filing 16 OBJECTIONS to #11 Non-Final Report and Recommendation filed by Deloris B. Luke and Sonja S. Yarbrough. (sap)
October 15, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Deloris B. Luke and Sonja S. Yarbrough re #15 Order. (sap)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #14 Motion to Stop Eviction. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 10/15/2019. (sap)
October 15, 2019 Filing 14 Emergency MOTION to Stop Eviction by Deloris B. Luke, Sonja S. Yarbrough. (jdb)
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Enjoin Najrian Capital LLC by Deloris B. Luke, Sonja S. Yarbrough. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Certificate of Service) (sap)
October 8, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Deloris B. Luke, Sonja S. Yarbrough re #11 Non-Final Report and Recommendation and #12 Order for Service of Non-Final Report and Recommendation. (sap)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for Service of #11 Non-Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. Each party may file written objections to the Non-Final Report and Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Non-Final Report and Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 10/8/2019. (sap)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 NON-FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Plaintiffs' #9 Emergency Motion for a Stay be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 10/8/2019. (sap)
October 7, 2019 Submission of #9 Emergency MOTION to Stay to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (sap)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 Emergency MOTION to Stay by Deloris B. Luke, Sonja S. Yarbrough. (sap)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 Withdrawal of #7 MOTION to Stay filed by Sonja S. Yarbrough, Deloris B. Luke. (sap)
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE Of Filing by Deloris B. Luke, Sonja S. Yarbrough (sap)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 Emergency MOTION to Stay by Deloris B. Luke, Sonja S. Yarbrough. (sap)
September 24, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Deloris B. Luke and Sonja S. Yarbrough re #4 Order. (sap)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Court DIRECTS Plaintiffs to REPLEAD their complaint within 21 days of the date of entry of this Order according to the terms and conditions set forth in the Order. If Plaintiffs do not comply with this Order, Plaintiffs are ADVISED that their complaint will be subject to dismissal. The Clerk is DIRECTED to re-submit this action in 24 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 9/24/2019. (sap)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Sonja S. Yarbrough, Deloris B. Luke. Chase Bank, NA served on 9/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipts) (sap)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Sonja S. Yarbrough, Deloris B. Luke. Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC served on 9/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipts) (sap)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Chase Bank, NA. (eop)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC. (eop)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Sonja S. Yarbrough and Deloris B. Luke. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number GAN100115781) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yarbrough et al v. Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Corey Tova Rothschild
Represented By: Bret Jacob Chaness
Represented By: Aaron Alan Wagner
Represented By: John Michael Kearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deloris B. Luke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonja S. Yarbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?