Hayes Shibley v. Center State Bank et al
Appellee: Center State Bank, Private Bank of Buckhead/National Bank of Commerce/CenterstateBank, N.A., Leslie Pinero, Daniel R. Smith, Reece Marr, Esq., Daniel Richard Smith and Lindsay P.S. Kolba, Esq.
Appellant: Jon Michael Hayes Shibley
Case Number: 1:2019cv04236
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Appellant is therefore ORDERED to show cause why this action should not be dismissed pursuant to Local Rule 41.3(A)(2) for want of prosecution within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit this matter to the undersigned if Appellant fails to comply. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 11/12/2019. (jed)
November 12, 2019 Submission of #5 Order to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Appellant is DIRECTED to pay the $298.00 appeal fee to the Bankruptcy Court or file the appropriate application and supporting documents to obtain in forma pauperis status in this Court within fourteen (14) days. If Appellant pays the appeal fee to the Bankruptcy Court, he is likewise ORDERED to notify this Court in writing within fourteen (14) days. Failure to comply with this Order will result in the dismissal of this action. The Clerk is directed to submit this matter to the undersigned if Appellant fails to comply. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 10/23/2019. (rjs)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Briefing Schedule to all parties. Appellant's Brief due by 11/22/2019. (rjs)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED (Attachments: #1 Doc99, #2 Doc100, #3 Doc103, #4 Doc104, #5 Doc116, #6 Doc133, #7 Doc139 (transcript for 7/22 hearing), #8 Doc141, #9 Doc142, #10 Doc143 (transcript for 5/9 hearing), #11 Doc144 (transcript for 6/13 hearing), #12 Doc145 (transcript for 7/22 hearing), #13 Doc146 Motion to stay appeal, #14 Doc147, #15 Docket Sheet)(Lugo, Yahaira)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 BANKRUPTCY RECORD RECEIVED - PART 1 (Attachments: #1 Doc1, #2 Doc5, #3 Doc6, #4 Doc18, #5 Doc19, #6 Doc54, #7 Doc55, #8 Doc60, #9 Doc61, #10 Doc62, #11 Doc63, #12 Doc64, #13 Doc66, #14 Doc67, #15 Doc68, #16 Doc69, #17 Doc70, #18 Doc71, #19 Doc72, #20 Doc73, #21 Doc77, #22 Doc79, #23 Doc82, #24 Doc84, #25 Doc85, #26 Doc86, #27 Doc87, #28 Doc88, #29 Doc90)(Lugo, Yahaira)
September 25, 2019 Submission of #1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal for Fee determination, to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (eop)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal, USBC Case#: 18-68584-lrc filed by Jon Michael Hayes Shibley. Notice of Appeal filed 9/18/19 from Order entered 9/5/19 by Appellant Jon Michael Hayes Shibley. Fee Paid: No. (Attachments: #1 Doc. 114 - NOA, #2 Doc. -108 - Order, #3 Docket Report)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayes Shibley v. Center State Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Center State Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Private Bank of Buckhead/National Bank of Commerce/CenterstateBank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Leslie Pinero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Daniel R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Reece Marr, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Daniel Richard Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Lindsay P.S. Kolba, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jon Michael Hayes Shibley
Represented By: Paul Reece Marr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?