Rampersaud et al v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Padmini Rampersaud and Alishan Abdulaziz
Defendant: Denise Frazier, Debra A. Rodgers, Kevin K. Mcaleenan, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, William Barr and Kevin Riddle
Case Number: 1:2019cv04269
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Charles A Pannell
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (tcc)
November 6, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of all defendants without prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (tcc)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to all Defendants filed by Alishan Abdulaziz, Padmini Rampersaud (Echols, Eli)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Alishan Abdulaziz, Padmini Rampersaud. Kevin Riddle served on 9/27/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. (Echols, Eli)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Alishan Abdulaziz, Padmini Rampersaud. Denise Frazier served on 9/27/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. (Echols, Eli)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Alishan Abdulaziz, Padmini Rampersaud. Debra A. Rodgers served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Echols, Eli)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Alishan Abdulaziz, Padmini Rampersaud. Kenneth T. Cuccinelli served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Echols, Eli)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Alishan Abdulaziz, Padmini Rampersaud. Kevin K. Mcaleenan served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Echols, Eli)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by Alishan Abdulaziz, Padmini Rampersaud. William Barr served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Echols, Eli)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to William Barr as U.S. Attorney General,Kevin K. Mcaleenan, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Debra A. Rodgers, Denise Frazier, and Kevin Riddle. (Attachments: #1 Summons Defendant Kevin McAleenan, #2 Summons Defendant Kenneth Cuccinelli, #3 Summons Defendant Debra Rodgers, #4 Summons Defendant Denise Frazier, #5 Summons Defendant Kevin Riddle) (jed)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Mandamus Relief filed by Alishan Abdulaziz and Padmini Rampersaud. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC- 8951735) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Form I-130 Receipt, #2 Exhibit Form I-130 Filing, #3 Exhibit Processing Times, #4 Exhibit Efforts to Follow Up, #5 Exhibit Additional Marriage Bona Fides, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (jed) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rampersaud et al v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra A. Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. Mcaleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Riddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Padmini Rampersaud
Represented By: Eli Aragorn Echols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alishan Abdulaziz
Represented By: Eli Aragorn Echols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?