Taylor v. Stukes
Plaintiff: Joanne Taylor
Defendant: Marshall W. Stukes, III
Case Number: 1:2019cv04275
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Referring Judge: Catherine M Salinas
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1963
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Marshall W. Stukes, III at 370 Dix Lee On Drive Fayetteville, GA 30214 re #11 Order to Show Cause. (tmf)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendant Marshall W. Stukes, III is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE why he should not be held in contempt and to appear at a hearing on Tuesday, October 22, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 2107 before Judge Leigh Martin May. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/23/2019. (tmf)
September 23, 2019 Submission of #9 MOTION for Contempt, #10 Order to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (tmf)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit Plaintiff's motion for civil contempt [Doc. #9 ] to United States District Judge Leigh Martin May to schedule a civil contempt hearing and to determine whether a civil contempt finding should be made against Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 9/23/2019. (tmf)
September 23, 2019 Submission of #9 MOTION for Contempt, to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (tmf)
September 23, 2019 Case reported statistically. Matter transferred from 1:19-mi-0038. (tmf)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 (Construed by Chambers) MOTION for Contempt: found within #8 Status Report, by Joanne Taylor. (tmf)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT by Joanne Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Correspondence, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Non-Appearance, #3 Exhibit C - Fee Invoice)(Hughes, Ashley)
August 22, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Joanne Taylor re #7 Order on Motion. (eop)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Compel Defendant's appearance at a deposition. Defendant is ORDERED to appear at a post-judgment deposition on August 29. 2019 at 1:00pm at the Evins Law Firm, LLC, 1198 Buckhead Crossing, Suite B, Woodstock, Georgia 30189. Defendant is cautioned that failure to abide by this Order may result in serious sanctions, including a finding of civil contempt. In addition to service by the Clerk's office. Plaintiff's counsel shall send a copy of this Order to Defendant by both U.S. mail and e-mail and shall also call Defendant on the phone to advise him of this Order. On or before September 15, 2019, Plaintiff shall file a Status Report on the docket to advise the Court regarding Defendant's compliance with this Order and what further assistance Plaintiff needs, if any, from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 8/22/19. (eop) Modified text on 9/13/2019 (eop).
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT Updated by Joanne Taylor. (Hughes, Ashley)
August 19, 2019 Submission of #5 Status Report; and #4 Order to Show Cause, to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (eop)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT by Joanne Taylor. (Hughes, Ashley)
August 1, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Marshall W. Stukes, III at 370 Dix Lee On Drive, Fayetteville, GA 30214 (address found within #3 pleading) re #4 Order to Show Cause. (tmf)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendant is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE as to why this Court should not sanction him for his failure to attend his deposition and his failure to produce the requested documents. Defendant is ORDERED to file a written response to this Order no later than Monday, August 12, 2019. Additionally, Defendant is ORDERED to contact Plaintiff's counsel by telephone to discuss rescheduling the deposition. Counsel's contact information is as follows: Ashley L. Hughes with the Evins Law Firm, LLC, (770) 592-2780. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 8/1/2019. (tmf)
July 26, 2019 Submission of #3 MOTION to Compel Discovery, to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (eop)
July 26, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Leigh Martin May and Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-mi-38-LMM-CMS. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (eop)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Compel Discovery with Brief In Support by Joanne Taylor. (Hughes, Ashley)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Marshall W. Stukes III filed by Joanne Taylor (Hughes, Ashley)
March 20, 2019 WRIT of Execution issued in the amount of $127,111.29 plus prejudgment interest in the amount of $6,019.98 for a total judgment of $133,131.27 in favor of Joanne Taylor and against defendant, Marshall W. Stukes, III. (WRIT mailed to Attorney R. Scott Johnson) (eop)
February 26, 2019 Miscellaneous Case Terminated. (eop)
February 26, 2019 Filing Fee Paid: $ 47.00, receipt number 113E-8474421 (eop)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 REGISTRATION of Foreign Judgment filed by Joanne Taylor. (Judgment is entered against Marshall W. Stukes, III in the principal amount of $127,111.29, together with prejudgment interest in the amount of $6,019.98, for a total judgment of $133,131.27. (Attachments: #1 Default Judgment, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit -Letter)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Stukes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Taylor
Represented By: Albert Morris Myers, III
Represented By: Robert Scott Johnson
Represented By: Ashley Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall W. Stukes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?