The Jonathan D. Rosen Family Foundation, Inc. et al v. Baran et al
Plaintiff: Sanam Karki and The Jonathan D. Rosen Family Foundation, Inc.
Defendant: DHS, Kathy A. Baran, USCIS, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli and Kevin McAleenan
Case Number: 1:2019cv04301
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER. (Williams, Melaine)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons pursuant to FRCP 4(i), as to All Defendants. (Suttle, Brooks)
September 26, 2019 Clerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by The Jonathan D. Rosen Family Foundation, Inc.. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons by The Jonathan D. Rosen Family Foundation, Inc.. (Suttle, Brooks)
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Kathy A. Baran, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, DHS, Kevin McAleenan, USCIS. (Attachments: #1 Summons Cuccinelli, #2 Summons McAleenan, #3 Summons USCIS, #4 Summons DHS)(bnp)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by The Jonathan D. Rosen Family Foundation, Inc. and Sanam Karki. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8957853) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Jonathan D. Rosen Family Foundation, Inc. et al v. Baran et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy A. Baran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanam Karki
Represented By: Brooks Allan Suttle
Represented By: Eileen Marie Golden Scofield
Represented By: Christopher Carl Marquardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Jonathan D. Rosen Family Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Brooks Allan Suttle
Represented By: Eileen Marie Golden Scofield
Represented By: Christopher Carl Marquardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?