Cardona et al v. Vivint Solar, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Cardona and Jerard Brown
Defendant: Vivint Solar Developer, LLC, Vivint Solar, Inc. and Solar Mosaic, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04405
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Janet F King
Referring Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Submission of #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and MOTION Modify Subpoena, to Magistrate Judge Janet F. King. (rlb)
October 1, 2019 Case reported statistically. Matter transferred from 1:19-MI-138-WMR-JFK. (rlb)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Quash SubpoenaMOTION Modify filed by Jerard Brown, Elizabeth Cardona. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, Motion to Compel Complete Responses to Plaintiffs' Rogs and RFPD directed to Vivint (as docketed 060619), #3 Exhibit C, Vivint's Brief in Opp to Plfs MTC responses (as docketed 062719), #4 Exhibit D, Pulipati Order dated Mar 6 2019, #5 Exhibit E, Letter Order dated Jan 25 2019, #6 Exhibit F, Droney Order)(Holcombe, Justin)
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Tharpe Holcombe on behalf of Jerard Brown, Elizabeth Cardona (Holcombe, Justin)
September 17, 2019 Submission of #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena or MOTION to Modify Subpoena, to Magistrate Judge Janet F. King. (eop)
September 13, 2019 Filing Fee Paid: $ 47.00, receipt number AGANDC-8931485 (eop)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM H. ROOKS on behalf of Solar Mosaic, Inc., Vivint Solar Developer and LLC, Vivint Solar, Inc. (eop)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena, or MOTION to Modify Subpoena with Memorandum of Law In Support by Solar Mosaic, Inc., Vivint Solar Developer, LLC and Vivint Solar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Affidavit - Certification of Counsel, #4 Notice of Motion, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cardona et al v. Vivint Solar, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Cardona
Represented By: Justin Tharpe Holcombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerard Brown
Represented By: Justin Tharpe Holcombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivint Solar Developer, LLC
Represented By: William Rooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivint Solar, Inc.
Represented By: William Rooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solar Mosaic, Inc.
Represented By: William Rooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?