Goguette et al v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rossevelt Goguette, Kathleen T. Goguette and Roossevelt Goguette
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association and Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04455
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Catherine M Salinas
Referring Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #9 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint is now due 12/19/2019; U.S. Bank National Association Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint is now due 12/19/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 11/27/2019. (drg)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #7 Amended Complaint,, or Otherwise Respond to First Amended Complaint by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kearns, John)
November 15, 2019 Remark: Updated spelling of name for plaintiff Roossevelt Goguette per the #7 Amended Complaint (sap)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw KaRon L. Grimes as Attorneyby Kathleen T. Goguette, Roossevelt Goguette. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grimes, KaRon)
November 15, 2019 Submission of #5 MOTION to Stay Certain Pre-Trial Deadlines to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (sap)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Kathleen T. Goguette, Roossevelt Goguette. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Verification, #2 Exhibit A - Warranty Deed, #3 Exhibit B - Security Deed, #4 Exhibit C C - Unlimited to Fontaine, #5 Exhibit D - WD to Goguette, #6 Exhibit E - WD Goguette to Goguette, #7 Lis Pendens)(Grimes, KaRon) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Plaintiff Roossevelt Goguette's name corrected on 11/15/2019 (sap).
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Kathleen T. Goguette, Rossevelt Goguette. (Grimes, KaRon)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay Certain Pre-Trial Deadlines by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kearns, John)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A -- Amended Complaint (Prior Action), #3 Exhibit B -- R&R (Prior Action), #4 Exhibit C -- Final Order (Prior Action))(Kearns, John)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #2 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' answer(s) or other responses to Plaintiff's complaint are now due on or before October 24, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 10/08/2019. (drg)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kearns, John)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT. filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., and U.S. Bank National Association. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-8979772) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Service Papers, #2 Exhibit -B -Tax Information, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goguette et al v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Campbell
Represented By: John Michael Kearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Campbell
Represented By: John Michael Kearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rossevelt Goguette
Represented By: KaRon L. Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen T. Goguette
Represented By: KaRon L. Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roossevelt Goguette
Represented By: KaRon L. Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?