Steamfitters Local 449 Pension & Retirement Security Funds v. Merrill et al
Plaintiff: Steamfitters Local 449 Pension & Retirement Security Funds
Defendant: Brian C. Beazer, Stephen P. Zelnak, Jr., Elizabeth S. Acton, Laurent Alpert, Beazer Homes USA, Inc., Allan P. Merrill, Robert L. Salomon, Larry T. Solari, Norma A. Provencio, Peter G. Leemputte, Peter M. Orser and Danny R. Shepherd
Case Number: 1:2019cv04617
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Referring Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (tmf)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Consolidate Cases. The actions styled Phillip Gottlieb v. Beazer, et. al., Case No. 19-cv-03377-LMM; Krishna Patel v. Beazer, et. al. Case No. 19-cv-03474-LMM; Jared Abrams v. Beazer, et. al. Case No. 19- cv-03868-LMM; and Steamfitters Local 449 Pension & Retirement Security Funds v. Merrill, et al.. Civil Action No. 1:19-cv-04617-LMM are consolidated for all purposes pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a). The Clerk of Court shall administratively close Civil Action Nos 19-cv-03474-LMM, 19-cv-03868-LMM, and 19-cv-04617-LMM and all future filings in the consolidated action shall be made in Civil Action No. 19- CV-03377-LMM under the new caption: IN RE BEAZER HOMES USA, INC. DERIVATIVE LITIGATION; Consolidated Case No. 1:17-cv-03377-LMM. See order for further specifics. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 12/10/2019. (tmf)
December 10, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Leigh Martin May. Judge Michael L. Brown no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-cv-4617-LMM. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (jta)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The undersigned RECUSES himself from the above-styled actionand DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to reassign this matter in accordancewith internal operating procedures. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/10/19. (jta)
December 10, 2019 Notification of Docket Correction re #13 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Order Addressing Scheduling MattersMOTION for Order. Two-part motion filed as one-part. The Clerk has made the necessary corrections. (jta)
December 9, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Order Addressing Scheduling Matters with Brief In Support by Elizabeth S. Acton, Laurent Alpert, Brian C. Beazer, Beazer Homes USA, Inc., Peter G. Leemputte, Allan P. Merrill, Peter M. Orser, Norma A. Provencio, Robert L. Salomon, Danny R. Shepherd, Larry T. Solari, Stephen P. Zelnak, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rezek, Bethany) . Added MOTION for Order on 12/10/2019 (jta).
November 22, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Erik W. Luedeke re #12 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jta)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Erik w. Luedeke. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/22/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jta)
November 22, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Benny C. Goodman, III re Approval of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (jta)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Benny C. Goodman, III. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/22/19. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jta)
November 21, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Erik W. Luedeke Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9096343). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Erik William Luedeke added appearing on behalf of Steamfitters Local 449 Pension & Retirement Security Funds (pmb)
November 21, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Benny C. Goodman, III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number CGANDC-9096174). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Benny C. Goodman, III added appearing on behalf of Steamfitters Local 449 Pension & Retirement Security Funds (pmb)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Erik W. Luedeke Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9096343). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Steamfitters Local 449 Pension & Retirement Security Funds. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A)(Herman, John)
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Benny C. Goodman, III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number CGANDC-9096174). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Steamfitters Local 449 Pension & Retirement Security Funds. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A)(Herman, John)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) granting Defendant Beazer Homes USA, Inc.'s #8 Motion for Extension of Time, up to and including 12/9/2019, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Ordered by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/12/2019. (bgt)
November 8, 2019 Notification of Docket Correction re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Incorrect event used. The Clerk has made the necessary corrections. (jta)
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by Beazer Homes USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pope, B.) Modified on 11/8/2019 to edit text to accurately relflect e-filed document (jta).
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons by Beazer Homes USA, Inc.. (Pope, B.)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by B. Warren Pope on behalf of Beazer Homes USA, Inc. (Pope, B.)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Bethany Marie Rezek on behalf of Beazer Homes USA, Inc. (Rezek, Bethany)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Steamfitters Local 449 Pension & Retirement Security Funds. Beazer Homes USA, Inc. served on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Herman, John)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 11/26/2018. (bgt)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(ddm)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Steamfitters Local 449 Pension & Retirement Security Funds. (Filing fee $400, receipt number GANDC-9005398) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steamfitters Local 449 Pension & Retirement Security Funds v. Merrill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian C. Beazer
Represented By: Bethany Marie Rezek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen P. Zelnak, Jr.
Represented By: Bethany Marie Rezek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth S. Acton
Represented By: Bethany Marie Rezek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurent Alpert
Represented By: Bethany Marie Rezek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beazer Homes USA, Inc.
Represented By: Bethany Marie Rezek
Represented By: B. Warren Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan P. Merrill
Represented By: Bethany Marie Rezek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Salomon
Represented By: Bethany Marie Rezek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry T. Solari
Represented By: Bethany Marie Rezek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma A. Provencio
Represented By: Bethany Marie Rezek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter G. Leemputte
Represented By: Bethany Marie Rezek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter M. Orser
Represented By: Bethany Marie Rezek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny R. Shepherd
Represented By: Bethany Marie Rezek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steamfitters Local 449 Pension & Retirement Security Funds
Represented By: Peter M. Jones
Represented By: Carlton R. Jones
Represented By: John C. Herman
Represented By: Erik William Luedeke
Represented By: Benny C. Goodman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?