Carey et al v. The Georgia Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Melissa Riley Carey and Wallace Riley
Defendant: Dr. Sharon Lewis, Antoine Caldwell, The Georgia Department of Corrections, Zelda Cummings and John and Jane Doe Corrections Officers 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv04630
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (rlb)
October 23, 2019 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #5 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii) (rlb)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION of Dismissal Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Melissa Riley Carey, Wallace Riley. (Leibel, Steven)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wallace Riley, Melissa Riley Carey. Zelda Cummings waiver mailed on 10/18/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (Leibel, Steven)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wallace Riley, Melissa Riley Carey. Sharon Lewis waiver mailed on 10/18/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (Leibel, Steven)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to COMPLAINT FOUND WITHIN THE #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by The Georgia Department of Corrections, Antoine Caldwell and Special Appearance Answer by Zelda Cummings, Sharon Lewis. (Originally filed in Fulton County State Court.) Discovery ends on 3/13/2020.(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by The Georgia Department of Corrections, Sharon Lewis, Zelda Cummings, Antoine Caldwell. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-9006854) (Attachments: #1 State Notice of Removal, #2 Answer, #3 State Pleadings, #4 Sheriff's Entry of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carey et al v. The Georgia Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Riley Carey
Represented By: Steven Keith Leibel
Represented By: Paul David Menair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wallace Riley
Represented By: Steven Keith Leibel
Represented By: Paul David Menair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Sharon Lewis
Represented By: Elizabeth McRary Crowder
Represented By: Peter Francis Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antoine Caldwell
Represented By: Elizabeth McRary Crowder
Represented By: Peter Francis Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Georgia Department of Corrections
Represented By: Elizabeth McRary Crowder
Represented By: Peter Francis Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zelda Cummings
Represented By: Elizabeth McRary Crowder
Represented By: Peter Francis Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe Corrections Officers 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?