Peoples v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ashley Peoples
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04835
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Referring Judge: John K Larkins
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. Discovery ends on 5/18/2020.(Fiorilla, Louis) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J Landreau on behalf of Ashley Peoples (Landreau, Matthew)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons by Ashley Peoples. (Groghan, Scot)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (tcc)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. (tcc)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Ashley Peoples. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9036789) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peoples v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Louis G. Fiorilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Peoples
Represented By: Scot W. Groghan
Represented By: Matthew J Landreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?