Williams v. King et al
Plaintiff: John T. Williams and Williams, Scott & Associates LLC
Defendant: Magistrate Judge Janet King, Magistrate Judge E. Clayton Scofield, III and Magistrate Judge Gerrilyn G. Brill
Case Number: 1:2019cv04856
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Williams, Scott & Associates LLC c/o John T. Williams re #9 Clerk's Judgment, #8 Order to Dismiss. (jed)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (jed)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address for John T. Williams and Williams, Scott & Associates LLC (jed)
November 22, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (jed)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order to Dismiss: Since the express terms of 28 U.S.C. 351(a) required Williams to file his Complaint with the Clerk of Court for the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals, this Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction over this matter and must dismiss Williamss claims. To the extent Williams intends to pursue these claims, he must refile his Complaint with the Clerk of Court for the United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit. Based on the foregoing, Williams's Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/22/2019. (jed)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address for John T. Williams (jpa)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #4 Standing Order, by John T. Williams. (tcc)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by John T. Williams. (rjs)
November 6, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to John T. Williams re #4 Order. (jpa)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. All counsel of record and pro se parties are required to sign and file, within 10 days after entry of this Order, a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/2/19. (jpa) Modified on 11/6/2019 (jpa).
November 5, 2019 Submission of #3 Complaint to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg for frivolity review. (jed)
November 5, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to John T. Williams re #2 Order. (jed)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by John T. Williams, Williams and Scott & Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jed) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used- forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: After consideration by the Court of plaintiffs affidavit of indigency, the plaintiff's #1 motion to proceed in forma pauperis is hereby GRANTED pursuant to Section 1915(a), and the individual plaintiff shall be allowed to proceed with this action without prepayment of docket costs or United States Marshal Service fees. The Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to submit this action to the appropriate District Court Judge for a frivolity determination pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janet F. King on 11/4/2019. (jed)
November 4, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge Janet F. King. (bnp)
October 30, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (bnp)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John T. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. King et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John T. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Williams, Scott & Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magistrate Judge Janet King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magistrate Judge E. Clayton Scofield, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magistrate Judge Gerrilyn G. Brill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?