Oppenheimer v. Private Eye Limo, LLC et al
Plaintiff: David Oppenheimer
Defendant: Cameron Reeves, Kristopher Johnson and Private Eye Limo, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv04885
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Oppenheimer. Cameron Reeves waiver mailed on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020. (Andersen, Evan)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Oppenheimer. Private Eye Limo, LLC waiver mailed on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020. (Andersen, Evan)
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Oppenheimer. Kristopher Johnson waiver mailed on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020. (Andersen, Evan)
November 15, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Register of Copyrights re #5 A.O. Form 121 Copyright. (bnp)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (bnp)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED AO 121 . (Andersen, Evan)
November 14, 2019 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 121. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 121. See LR 3.4. Docket the form using the event AO 121, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (ah)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/4/19. (bnp)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons by David Oppenheimer. (Andersen, Evan)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by David Oppenheimer (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9044199). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oppenheimer v. Private Eye Limo, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Oppenheimer
Represented By: Evan A. Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristopher Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Private Eye Limo, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?