Uzomba v. LoanDepot.com LLC
Appellant: Kennedy C. Uzomba
Appellee: LoanDepot.com LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv04886
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kennedy C. Uzomba re #4 Order. (jed)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 11/6/2019. (jed)
November 5, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing LoanDepot.com LLC and Kennedy C. Uzomba as to LoanDepot.com LLC, Kennedy C. Uzomba regarding #3 Order. (mlb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
November 4, 2019 Submission of #2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (eop)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Kennedy C. Uzomba. (eop)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal, USBC Case#: 19-57632pmb, filed by Kennedy C. Uzomba. Notice of Appeal filed 10/29/19 from Order entered 10/28/19 by Appellant, Kennedy C. Uzomba. Fee Paid: No. (Attachments: #1 Doc. 82 - Notice of Appeal, #2 Doc. 80 - Order, #3 Docket Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2019: #4 Correct PDF -Main Document - Submission Sheet) (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uzomba v. LoanDepot.com LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Kennedy C. Uzomba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LoanDepot.com LLC
Represented By: Brian Kenneth Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?