Boxley v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Marie Boxley
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Bank of America Corporation, Synchrony Financial, JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. and Citibank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04907
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Justin S Anand
Referring Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Synchrony Financial. (Gilroy, Monica)
December 27, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Synchrony Financial identifying Corporate Parent Synchrony Bank for Synchrony Financial by Synchrony Financial.(Gilroy, Monica)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Bank of America Corporation Answer due 2/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 12/23/19. (bnw)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time file response to Complaint re: #1 Complaint, by Bank of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mendel, Jarrod) (bnw).
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lisa Marie Boxley. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. waiver mailed on 11/4/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Sieg, Paul)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lisa Marie Boxley. JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. waiver mailed on 11/4/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Sieg, Paul)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Lisa Marie Boxley. (Sieg, Paul)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lisa Marie Boxley. Synchrony Financial waiver mailed on 11/4/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Sieg, Paul)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Lisa Marie Boxley. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9046390) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boxley v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Jarrod Sean Mendel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Financial
Represented By: Monica Kocurek Gilroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Marie Boxley
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Berry
Represented By: Adam Klein
Represented By: Paul Jonathan Sieg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?