Woods et al v. Paper Gang, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tanya Love and Calvin Woods
Defendant: Paper Gang, Inc., Juaquain Brownfield, Audio and Video Labs Inc., Steven Hayes, Marques Brownfield and Brandon Sands
Case Number: 1:2019cv04968
Filed: November 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Audio and Video Labs Inc. Answer due 1/27/2020. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 12/23/19. (rlb)
December 23, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Audio and Video Labs Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pequignot, William)
December 23, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Audio and Video Labs Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Downtown Music Holdings, Ltd., Corporate Parent AVL Holdings (IOM) Ltd., Corporate Parent AVL Digital US, Inc., Corporate Parent AVL Holding Inc. for Audio and Video Labs Inc.. (Pequignot, William)
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by William Andrew Pequignot on behalf of Audio and Video Labs Inc. (Pequignot, William)
December 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Fortune Moore on behalf of Audio and Video Labs Inc. (Moore, Lisa)
December 16, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Tanya Love, Calvin Woods. Brandon Sands served on 12/14/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Boddie, Corey)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Tanya Love, Calvin Woods. Paper Gang, Inc. served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (Boddie, Corey)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Tanya Love, Calvin Woods. Audio and Video Labs Inc. served on 11/5/2019, answer due 11/26/2019. (Boddie, Corey)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (rlb)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Juaquain Brownfield, Marques Brownfield, Steven Hayes, Paper Gang, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Paper Gang, #2 Summons M. Brownfield, #3 Summons Hayes)(rlb)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED AO 121 . (Attachments: #1 Supplement ATTACHMENT TO AO 121, #2 Supplement COPYRIGHT REG 1, #3 Supplement COPYRIGHT REG 2)(Boddie, Corey)
November 5, 2019 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 121. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 121. See LR 3.4. Docket the form using the event AO 121, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (ah)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Tanya Love, Calvin Woods Summons (Attachments: #1 Summons J Brownfield Summons, #2 Summons Hayes Summons, #3 Summons M Brownfield Summons, #4 Summons Papergang Summons)(Boddie, Corey)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Brandon Sands and Audio and Video Labs Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Audio and Video Labs Inc. p/k/a CD Baby)(ah)
November 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Calvin Woods and Tanya Love (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9051936). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Summons incorrect, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods et al v. Paper Gang, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paper Gang, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juaquain Brownfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audio and Video Labs Inc.
Represented By: Lisa Fortune Moore
Represented By: William Andrew Pequignot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marques Brownfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Sands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Love
Represented By: Corey Delon Boddie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Woods
Represented By: Corey Delon Boddie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?