Benchmark IS, LLC v. John Doe
Plaintiff: Benchmark IS, LLC
Defendant: Lanier Clark and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv04973
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Charles A Pannell
Referring Judge: Linda T Walker
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Benchmark IS, LLC, Lanier Clark, John Doe re #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation, #6 Letter. (tcc)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 Certified copy of #5 Order e-filed with the Clerk of Court, Magistrate Court of Fulton County. (tcc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2019: #1 Receipt) (tcc).
December 2, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (tcc)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - After carefully considering the #3 Final Report and Recommendation of the magistrate judge and finding no error, the court receives the report and recommendation with approval and adopts it as the opinion and order of this court, and this action is REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 12/2/2019. (tcc)
November 8, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Benchmark IS, LLC, Lanier Clark re #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (tcc)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 11/7/2019. (tcc)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order (Contained w/in #3 Final R&R) ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 11/7/2019. (tcc)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING that this action be REMANDED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County. As this is a final Report and Recommendation and there are no other matters pending before this Court, the Clerk is directed to terminate the reference to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 11/7/2019. (tcc)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Lanier Clark.(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
November 6, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (eop)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Lanier Clark. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benchmark IS, LLC v. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benchmark IS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lanier Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?