3390 Fairburn Road, SW et al v. Davis
Plaintiff: 3390 Fairburn Road, SW, Atlanta LLC and The Life Properties LLC
Defendant: Lyonal Davis
Case Number: 1:2019cv04990
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J Clay Fuller
Referring Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 Receipt of Electronic filing of the #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation with the Magistrate Court of Fulton County. (jpa)
December 10, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (jpa)
December 10, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to 3390 Fairburn Road, SW, Atlanta LLC, Lyonal Davis, The Life Properties LLC re #5 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (jpa)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER adopting #3 Final Report and Recommendation. The Court REMANDS this action to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 12/10/19. (jpa)
December 4, 2019 Submission of #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (jpa)
November 12, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to 3390 Fairburn Road, SW; Atlanta LLC; Lyonal Davis; The Life Properties LLC re #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (jed)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 11/12/2019. (jed)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 11/12/2019 within #3 R&R. (jed)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removal. Because Defendants have not shown that the original complaint contains a federal claim or otherwise presents a federal question, they have not established that this Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this action, so removal is improper. The undersigned therefore RECOMMENDS that this action be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference of this case to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 11/12/2019. (jed)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Lyonal Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jed) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
November 8, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (eop)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Lyonal Davis. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 3390 Fairburn Road, SW et al v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 3390 Fairburn Road, SW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlanta LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Life Properties LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyonal Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?