Brown v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Angela Michelle Brown
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv04996
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Referring Judge: John K Larkins
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Application of Kenneth R. Hiller for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 12/23/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jed)
December 18, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Kenneth R. Hiller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9163038). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Kenneth R Hiller added appearing on behalf of Angela Michelle Brown (pmb)
December 10, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Kenneth R. Hiller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9163038). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Angela Michelle Brown. (Flynn, Kathleen)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons U.S. Atty, #2 Summons Atty Gen)(tcc)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by Angela Michelle Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - Plaintiff's #1 IFP application is GRANTED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a), as it appears that she is without sufficient funds to pay the fees and costs of this action and still provide for the necessities of life. Plaintiff shall be allowed to proceed without payment of filing fees, service costs, or any costs of court. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to serve the appropriate parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 11/7/2019. (tcc)
November 6, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (ah)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Angela Michelle Brown. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Summons Proposed, #5 Summons Proposed, #6 Summons Proposed, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Michelle Brown
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Flynn
Represented By: Kenneth R Hiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?