Smith v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Michael Arnes Smith
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv04997
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Bly
Referring Judge: Orinda D Evans
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Kenneth R. Hiller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9162017). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Kenneth R Hiller added appearing on behalf of Michael Arnes Smith (pmb)
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Kenneth R. Hiller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9162017). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Michael Arnes Smith. (Flynn, Kathleen)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Office of Regional Chief Counsel, #2 U. S. Attorney)(bdb)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by Michael Arnes Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This action shall go forward as any other civil case, and Plaintiff is allowed to proceed without prepayment of a filing fee. Plaintiff is represented by counsel and has not requested that the Court order that service of the summons and complaint be made by the U. S. Marshal. Counsel for Plaintiff is therefore appointed to effect service of process upon Defendant under Rule 4(c) of the FRCVP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 11/6/2019. (bdb)
November 6, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION to District Judge Orinda D. Evans for review. (ah)
November 6, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (ah)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael Arnes Smith. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Summons Proposed, #5 Summons Proposed, #6 Summons Proposed, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Arnes Smith
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Flynn
Represented By: Kenneth R Hiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?