Oliver v. Kemp
Plaintiff: Anthony Oliver
Defendant: Brian Kemp
Case Number: 1:2019cv05014
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Referring Judge: Janet F King
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Anthony Oliver re #6 Order on Final Report and Recommendation, #7 Clerk's Judgment. (rsh)
December 11, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (rsh)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing action without prejudice upon adoption of Magistrate Judge's report and recommendation. (rsh)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER adopting #4 Final Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff Anthony Oliver's in forma pauperis status is denied and this action is dismissed without prejudice. Clerk directed to close case. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 12/11/19. (rsh)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Anthony Oliver re #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #5 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. Return to Sender. Not Deliverable As Addressed. Unable to Forward. No Longer at This Address. (tcc)
November 22, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #5 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation to Anthony Oliver at initial address of record at the Chatham County Detention Center and his updated address of record at the Georgia Diagnostic and Classification Prison. (adg)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Service of #4 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Janet F. King. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janet F. King on 11/20/2019. (adg)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Plaintiff be DENIED in forma pauperis status and that the #1 Complaint DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janet F. King on 11/20/2019. (adg)
November 8, 2019 Submission of #2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account for IFP and Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Janet F. King. (eop)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE Of Filing, Notice of Interested Parties by Anthony Oliver (eop)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by Anthony Oliver. (eop)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Anthony Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Complaint - Part 2, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet - 2, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Exhibit -Letter)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliver v. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?