FYR SFR Borrower, LLC v. Dameran et al
Plaintiff: FYR SFR Borrower, LLC
Defendant: Tara Dameran and Ceresa Mitchell
Case Number: 1:2019cv05029
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Referring Judge: Linda T Walker
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Newton County Magistrate Clerk re #5 Order and #6 Correspondence. (bnp)
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 Correspondence to Newton County Magistrate Court Clerk re #5 Remand Order. (bnp)
January 3, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (bnp)
January 3, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Tara Dameran, FYR SFR Borrower, LLC, Ceresa Mitchell re #5 Order. (bnp)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER adopting the #3 Final Report and Recommendation as the opinion of this Court. For the reasons stated in the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, the Court REMANDS this case to the Magistrate Court of Newton County. The Court notes that the Magistrate Judge warned defendants that continuing to file frivolous petitions for removal may result in monetary sanction and/or a bar on filing such actions without prior approval from the Court. There being no further issues before the Court, the Clerk is DIRECTED to close the case. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 1/3/2020. (bnp)
January 2, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Tara Dameran, FYR SFR Borrower, LLC, Ceresa Mitchell re #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (bnp)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 1/2/2020. (bnp)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 1/2/2020 within the #3 R&R. (bnp)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removal. The Court RECOMMENDS that this action be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Newton County. The Court warns Defendants that continuing to file frivolous petitions for removal may result in monetary sanctions and/or a bar on filing such actions without prior approval. As this is a final Report and Recommendation and there are no other matters pending before the Court, the Clerk is directed to terminate the reference to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 1/2/2020. (bnp)
January 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Ceresa Mitchell, Tara Dameran. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
November 12, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATIONS for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (for Tara Dameran and Ceresa Mitchell), to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (eop)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATIONS for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Tara Dameran and Ceresa Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 IFP -Application -Tara Dameran, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FYR SFR Borrower, LLC v. Dameran et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Dameran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ceresa Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FYR SFR Borrower, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?