Dixson v. Dovenmuehle Mortgage Inc.
Plaintiff: Freamon Dixson, Jr.
Defendant: Dovenmuehle Mortgage Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05036
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Alan J Baverman
Referring Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:l332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Freamon Dixson, Jr. re #5 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (tmf)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Service of #4 Final Report and Recommendation,, by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 12/26/2019. (tmf)
December 26, 2019 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Freamon Dixson, Jr.. The undersigned RECOMMENDS to the District Judge that he DENY the application to proceed IFP for failure to provide evidence of indigency. Ruled on at #4 R&R by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 12/26/2019. (tmf)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Complaint, filed by Freamon Dixson, Jr. The undersigned therefore RECOMMENDS to the District Judge that he DISMISS the case WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Rule 41.3 of the Local Rules of this Court for Plaintiff's failure to follow the Court's lawful order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 12/26/2019. (tmf)
December 26, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by Freamon Dixson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
November 18, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Freamon Dixson, Jr. re #2 Order. (sap)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: The Plaintiff is ORDERED, within 30 days of the date of this Order, to either (1) file an amended application to proceed IFP and answer the questions presented in the Order with greater specificity, or (2) pay the full filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 11/15/2019. (sap)
November 12, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (eop)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Freamon Dixson, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixson v. Dovenmuehle Mortgage Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freamon Dixson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dovenmuehle Mortgage Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?