First IC Bank v. North American Title Insurance Company
Plaintiff: First IC Bank
Defendant: North American Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv05055
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 First MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by North American Title Insurance Company. (Totten, Matthew)
December 18, 2019 Submission of #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (jed)
December 18, 2019 Notification of Docket Correction re #14 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Affidavits added MOTION to Strike. (jed)
December 17, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Exclude and Disregard or Alternatively and/or MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Affidavits with Brief In Support by North American Title Insurance Company. (Totten, Matthew) . Added MOTION to Strike on 12/18/2019 (jed).
December 17, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY BRIEF re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Complaint, filed by North American Title Insurance Company. (Totten, Matthew) Modified on 12/18/2019 to edit text (jed).
December 13, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION to Amend Complaint with Brief In Support by First IC Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's Proosed Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Plaintiff's Proposed Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Plaintiff's Proposed Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Plaintiff's Proposed Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Plaintiff's Proposed Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Plaintiff's Proposed Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Plaintiff's Proposed Amended Complaint, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8 to Plaintiff's Proposed Amended Complaint, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9 to Plaintiff's Proposed Amended Complaint, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10 to Plaintiff's Proposed Amended Complaint, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11 to Plaintiff's Proposed Amended Complaint, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12 to Plaintiff's Proposed Amended Complaint, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13 to Plaintiff's Proposed Amended Complaint, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14 to Plaintiff's Proposed Amended Complaint, #16 Supplement Certificate of Service CM/ECF)(Malone, C.)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Stay. All discovery, including initial disclosures, Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) conferences, and the joint preliminary report and discovery plan are hereby STAYED until the Court rules on Defendants Motion to Dismiss #2 . If the motion to dismiss is denied, in whole or in part, the parties shall have 14 days from the date the order denying such motion is entered in which to file their respective initial disclosures and the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 12/6/2019. (jed)
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Complaint, filed by First IC Bank. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Louise Lee Opposing Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Affidavit of First IC Bank in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #3 Certificate of Service CM/ECF)(Malone, C.)
December 2, 2019 Submission of the #3 MOTION to Stay Discovery to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (aaq)
November 25, 2019 Clerks Notation re #7 Certificate of Interested Persons, #8 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by SDG. (ash)
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION Certificate of Compliance by North American Title Insurance Company. (Totten, Matthew)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by North American Title Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent States Title Holding, Inc., Other Affiliate Lennar Financial Services for North American Title Insurance Company. (Totten, Matthew)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons by First IC Bank. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service CM/ECF)(Malone, C.)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER extending time through and including 12/3/2019 for plaintiff to respond to #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Complaint,. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/21/2019. (adg)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. All counsel of record and pro se parties are required to sign and file, within 10 days after entry of this Order, a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/2/19. (jpa)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Compliance by First IC Bank. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service CM/ECF)(Malone, C.) Modified on 11/14/2019 to edit event text (bnp).
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay Discovery with Brief In Support by North American Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Staying Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines)(Totten, Matthew)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Complaint, with Brief In Support by North American Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, ITIC CPL)(Totten, Matthew) Modified on 11/13/2019 to edit event type (bnp).
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-9065430) filed by North American Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rjs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First IC Bank v. North American Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew Franklin Totten
Represented By: Monica Kocurek Gilroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First IC Bank
Represented By: C. Cyrus Malone, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?