Harrison v. Norfolk Southern Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Tyrone Harrison
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company and Norfolk Southern Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv05188
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Referring Judge: Catherine M Salinas
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 First Certificate of Interested Persons by Tyrone Harrison. (Dobson, William)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting attorney Gregory O. Wiggins's #4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Ordered by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/2/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step. (bgt)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry only) granting attorney William Cox Tucker, Jr.'s #3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Ordered by Judge Michael L. Brown on 12/2/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step. (bgt)
November 27, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #4 APPLICATION for Admission of Gregory O. Wiggins Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9114779). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Gregory O. Wiggins added appearing on behalf of Tyrone Harrison (pmb)
November 27, 2019 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #3 APPLICATION for Admission of William Cox Tucker, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9114722). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney William C. Tucker, Jr. added appearing on behalf of Tyrone Harrison (pmb)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission of Gregory O. Wiggins Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9114779). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Tyrone Harrison. (Dobson, William)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Admission of William Cox Tucker, Jr. Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9114722). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Tyrone Harrison. (Dobson, William)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Corporation and Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (jap)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Tyrone Harrison (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9096386). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison v. Norfolk Southern Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Harrison
Represented By: Gregory O. Wiggins
Represented By: William Gregory Dobson
Represented By: William C. Tucker, Jr.
Represented By: A. Danielle McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?